This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2018 at 07:33:43 (UTC).

Welch v. Regions Bank

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Welch filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Regions Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02267

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Elizabeth A. Kovachevich

 

Party Details

Appellant

Angela Welch

Appellee

Regions Bank

In Re

Frank Michael Mongelluzzi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Robert F. Elgidely

Attorney at Genovese, Joblove & Battista, PA

Suite 1110, 200 E Broward Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Appellee Attorneys

Edmund S. Whitson, III

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

201 N Franklin St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Hanna Blair Perry Lahr

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

420 N 20Th St Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

D. Christopher Carson

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

420 N 20Th St Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER: Angela Welch's Motion to Transfer #4 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b), this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to United States District Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich, Tampa Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this case to District Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich, Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/9/2018. (JJH) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Regions Bank. Related case(s): yes (Whitson, Edmund) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Regions Bank. (Whitson, Edmund) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to transfer case filed by Regions Bank. (Whitson, Edmund) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Angela Welch. Related case(s): Yes (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Angela Welch. (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to transfer case by Angela Welch. (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#3

(#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/17/2018. (BGS) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#2

(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/17/2018. (BGS) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Transmittal

1 #1

Exhibit Opposition

#1

(#1) MOTION to withdraw reference by Angela Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition, #2 Exhibit Transmittal, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet)(DG) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • (#11) Case Reassigned to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. New case number: 8:18-cv-2267-T-17. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (JNB) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Angela Welch's Motion to Transfer #4 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b), this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to United States District Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich, Tampa Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this case to District Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich, Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/9/2018. (JJH) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Regions Bank. Related case(s): yes (Whitson, Edmund) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Regions Bank. (Whitson, Edmund) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to transfer case filed by Regions Bank. (Whitson, Edmund) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Angela Welch. Related case(s): Yes (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Angela Welch. (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to transfer case by Angela Welch. (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/17/2018. (BGS) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/17/2018. (BGS) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to withdraw reference by Angela Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition, #2 Exhibit Transmittal, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet)(DG) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.