This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 07:46:01 (UTC).

Welch, Jr et al v. C&A Transport LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Welch, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against C A Transport LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03078

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leslie Russell Welch

Benjamin Welch, Jr.

Yancy Welch

Benjamin Welch, Jr

Defendants

Amber Isaacks

Jarmmal Phillips

Averitt Express, Inc.

C&A Transport, LLC

C&A Transport LLC

Averitt Express Inc

Intervenors

Mattie Little

Katie Gorman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Kyle Findley

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin LLP

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

P. Jody Lavergne

Attorney at Stutes & Lavergne LLC

600 Broad Street

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Kala F. Sellers

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin LLP

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Adam D Lewis

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin LLP

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Kurt B Arnold

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin LLP

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Constance M Broome

Attorney at The Broome Firm PLLC

508 South 9Th Street

Midlothian, TX 76065

Lindsay G. Gorbach

Attorney at Cox PLLC

7859 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 310

Dallas, TX 75230

William R Moye

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77056

Stephanie Marion Krueger

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

One Riverway Drive, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Intervenor Attorneys

Steven P Lemoine

Attorney at Robert H Schmolke PLC

9191 Siegen Lane, Bldg 4-B

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Ronald C Richard

Attorney at Richard Law Firm LLC

One Lakeshore Drive, Suite 120

Lake Charles, LA 70629

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Exhibit(s) B

18 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#18

(#18) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by C&A Transport LLC re #13 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Moye, William) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE filed by C&A Transport LLC re: #13 MOTION to Remand (Moye, William) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #12 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C&A Transport LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Moye, William) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

15 #4

Exhibit(s) D

15 #3

Exhibit(s) C

15 #2

Exhibit(s) B

15 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#15

(#15) RESPONSE filed by Benjamin Welch, Jr, Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Findley, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#14

(#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch, Benjamin Welch Jr re #1 Notice of Removal #13 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Proposed Order) (Findley, Jonathan). (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Remand filed by Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch, Benjamin Welch Jr (Findley, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#12

(#12) AMENDED AND RESTATED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION WITH JURY DEMAND against Averitt Express Inc, C&A Transport LLC, Amber Isaacks, Jarmmal Phillips filed by Mattie Little, Katie Gorman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/12/2018) (aaa). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

6 #1

Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Averitt Express Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Gorbach, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

1 #27

Certificate of Interested Parties

1 #17

Exhibit(s) A-16

1 #16

Exhibit(s) A-15

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by C&A Transport LLC re #13 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Moye, William) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE filed by C&A Transport LLC re: #13 MOTION to Remand (Moye, William) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #12 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C&A Transport LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Moye, William) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE filed by Benjamin Welch, Jr, Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Findley, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch, Benjamin Welch Jr re #1 Notice of Removal #13 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Proposed Order) (Findley, Jonathan). (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Remand filed by Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch, Benjamin Welch Jr (Findley, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED AND RESTATED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION WITH JURY DEMAND against Averitt Express Inc, C&A Transport LLC, Amber Isaacks, Jarmmal Phillips filed by Mattie Little, Katie Gorman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/12/2018) (aaa). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven P Lemoine for Ronald C. Richard on behalf of Katie Gorman, Mattie Little. (Lemoine, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion to Intervene. Clerk to file Plaintiff-Intervenors Katie Gorman and Mattie Little's Amended Complaint (Doc. 9), not the Original Proposed Complaint-in-Intervention (Doc. 8). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/11/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #8 Motion to Intervene, by Intervenor Parties Katie Gorman, Mattie Little. (Lemoine, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION to Intervene filed by Katie Gorman, Mattie Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Complaint in Intervention, #2 Proposed Order). Party Katie Gorman added.Attorney Steven P Lemoine added to party Katie Gorman(pty:intv), Attorney Steven P Lemoine added to party Mattie Little(pty:intv) (Lemoine, Steven) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Averitt Express Inc re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Gorbach, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Averitt Express Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Gorbach, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William R Moye on behalf of C&A Transport, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moye, William) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William R Moye on behalf of C&A Transport, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moye, William) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C&A Transport, LLC. (Moye, William) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 86th Judicial District Court of Kaufman County, case number 100982-86 filed by C&A Transport, LLC, Jarmmal Phillips. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9595063) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) A-7, #9 Exhibit(s) A-8, #10 Exhibit(s) A-9, #11 Exhibit(s) A-10, #12 Exhibit(s) A-11, #13 Exhibit(s) A-12, #14 Exhibit(s) A-13, #15 Exhibit(s) A-14, #16 Exhibit(s) A-15, #17 Exhibit(s) A-16, #18 Exhibit(s) A-17, #19 Exhibit(s) A-18, #20 Exhibit(s) A-19, #21 Exhibit(s) A-20, #22 Exhibit(s) A-21, #23 Exhibit(s) A-22, #24 Exhibit(s) A-23, #25 Cover Sheet, #26 Cover Sheet Supplement, #27 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Moye, William) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.