This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 06:09:03 (UTC).

Weiland v. Crane Co.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2015 Weiland filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Crane Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and Ronald R. Lagueux. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

Ronald R. Lagueux

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Weiland

Defendants

Crane Co.

Zurn Industries, Inc.

Bucyrus International, Inc.

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Briggs & Stratton Corporation

Boston Scientific Corporation

Fisher Scientific Company, LLC

Trane US Inc.

Case IH, LLC

Honeywell International, Inc.

Beckman Coulter, Inc.

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.

Holland Furnace Co.

Riley Power Inc.

Cummins, Inc.

Bell & Gossett

Burnham LLC

Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A.

Dana Companies, LLC

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David A. Goldman

Attorney at CMBG3 Law LLC

265 Franklin Street, Suite 601, Suite 760

Boston, MA 02110

Other Attorneys

John E. Deaton

Attorney at The Deaton Law Firm

450 North Broadway

East Providence, RI 02914

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Exhibit a

#5

(#5) MOTION to Withdraw #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, #4 Notice (Other), #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co.. Responses due by 2/6/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Crane Co. of Pending Motions (Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Crane Co. (Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 4 part 2

1 #5

Exhibit 4 part 1

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence superior, case number 14-4430. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-814131, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 part 1, #6 Exhibit 4 part 2, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: Defendant Crane's motion to Withdraw the Notice of Removal is treated as a motion to voluntarily remand to the Superior Court. The Court grants this motion. So Ordered by Senior Judge Ronald R. Lagueux on 1/29/2015. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Senior Judge Ronald R. Lagueux and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Melendez, Filipa) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Withdraw #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, #4 Notice (Other), #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co.. Responses due by 2/6/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Crane Co. of Pending Motions (Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Crane Co. (Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence superior, case number 14-4430. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-814131, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 part 1, #6 Exhibit 4 part 2, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELL AND GOSSETT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURNHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HENDRICK O.B. VAN OTTERLOO TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where BECKMAN COULTER INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant