This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2018 at 07:45:24 (UTC).

Weibrecht v. AAA Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Weibrecht filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AAA Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberto A. Lange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04124

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roberto A. Lange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Weibrecht

Defendant

AAA Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon R. Falon

Attorney at Johnson, Janklow, Abdallah & Reiter, LLP

101 South Main Avenue, Suite 100, Po Box 2348

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-5933

Scott A. Abdallah

Attorney at Johnson, Janklow, Abdallah & Reiter, LLP

101 South Main Avenue, Suite 100, Po Box 2348

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-5933

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer L. Van Anne

Attorney at Woods, Fuller, Shultz & Smith, PC

Po Box 5027

Sioux Falls, SD 57117-5027

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/06/2018. (LH) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AAA Insurance Company. (Van Anne, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Mark Weibrecht. (Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to AAA Insurance Company. 1 original summons, 1 true copy of summons, 3 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#3

(#3) Filing Fee Received from Mark Weibrecht. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048111. (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Automobile Collision - 11-9-14

1 #1

Exhibit A - Insurance Policy - Policy Number AUI-003647012

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mark Weibrecht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy - Policy Number AUI-003647012, #2 Exhibit B - Automobile Collision - 11-9-14) (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/06/2018. (LH) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AAA Insurance Company. (Van Anne, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Mark Weibrecht. (Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to AAA Insurance Company. 1 original summons, 1 true copy of summons, 3 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing Fee Received from Mark Weibrecht. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048111. (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mark Weibrecht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy - Policy Number AUI-003647012, #2 Exhibit B - Automobile Collision - 11-9-14) (JLS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less