This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2018 at 07:15:58 (UTC).

Wei v. Pinduoduo Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 Wei filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Pinduoduo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07625

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jiaxiang Wei

Defendants

Jianming Yu

Junyun Xiao

Haifeng Lin

Lei Chen

Zhenwei Zheng

Nanpeng Shen

Zheng Huang

Zhen Zhang

Pinduoduo Inc.

Tian Xu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy Alan Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Joseph Alexander Hood, II

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Scott D. Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Robert Alexander Fumerton

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate,Meagher & Flom LLP(IIA)

Four Times Sq.,

New York, NY 10036

Michael Charles Griffin

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/18/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#12

(#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Robert A. Fumerton dated September 14, 2018. Document filed by Pinduoduo Inc..(Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Tencent Holdings Limited for Pinduoduo Inc.. Document filed by Pinduoduo Inc..(Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Pinduoduo Inc.. (Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Alexander Fumerton on behalf of Pinduoduo Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Pinduoduo Inc.. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lei Chen, Zheng Huang, Haifeng Lin, Pinduoduo Inc., Nanpeng Shen, Junyun Xiao, Tian Xu, Jianming Yu, Zhen Zhang, Zhenwei Zheng. (dnh) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 24, 2018 at 12:45 p.m. in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. (Initial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/22/18) (yv) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Jiaxiang Wei. (Hood, Joseph) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pinduoduo Inc., Zheng Huang, Tian Xu, Lei Chen, Zhenwei Zheng, Junyun Xiao, Haifeng Lin, Zhen Zhang, Nanpeng Shen, and Jianming Yu, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jiaxiang Wei. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pinduoduo Inc., Zheng Huang, Tian Xu, Lei Chen, Zhenwei Zheng, Junyun Xiao, Haifeng Lin, Zhen Zhang, Nanpeng Shen, and Jianming Yu, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jiaxiang Wei. (Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 8/22/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lei Chen, Zheng Huang, Haifeng Lin, Pinduoduo Inc., Nanpeng Shen, Junyun Xiao, Tian Xu, Jianming Yu, Zhen Zhang, Zhenwei Zheng. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15478924)Document filed by Jiaxiang Wei.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/18/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Robert A. Fumerton dated September 14, 2018. Document filed by Pinduoduo Inc..(Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Tencent Holdings Limited for Pinduoduo Inc.. Document filed by Pinduoduo Inc..(Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Pinduoduo Inc.. (Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Alexander Fumerton on behalf of Pinduoduo Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Pinduoduo Inc.. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lei Chen, Zheng Huang, Haifeng Lin, Pinduoduo Inc., Nanpeng Shen, Junyun Xiao, Tian Xu, Jianming Yu, Zhen Zhang, Zhenwei Zheng. (dnh) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 24, 2018 at 12:45 p.m. in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. (Initial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/22/18) (yv) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Jiaxiang Wei. (Hood, Joseph) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pinduoduo Inc., Zheng Huang, Tian Xu, Lei Chen, Zhenwei Zheng, Junyun Xiao, Haifeng Lin, Zhen Zhang, Nanpeng Shen, and Jianming Yu, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jiaxiang Wei. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on pdf 'To' section must include 'care of (c/o)';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jiaxiang Wei. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pinduoduo Inc., Zheng Huang, Tian Xu, Lei Chen, Zhenwei Zheng, Junyun Xiao, Haifeng Lin, Zhen Zhang, Nanpeng Shen, and Jianming Yu, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jiaxiang Wei. (Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 8/22/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Lei Chen, Zheng Huang, Haifeng Lin, Pinduoduo Inc., Nanpeng Shen, Junyun Xiao, Tian Xu, Jianming Yu, Zhen Zhang, Zhenwei Zheng. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15478924)Document filed by Jiaxiang Wei.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINDUODUO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alexander Fumerton Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Griffin