This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2019 at 07:36:43 (UTC).

Webster v. Boyd et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 Webster filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Boyd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerome T. Kearney and D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Leon Webster

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Defendants

Gibson

Marty Boyd

Becker

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Copies, and NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster. (jak) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to appoint counsel and granting #8 Motion for copies. The Clerk is directed to forward to Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeromy T. Kearney on 1/30/2019. (jak) (Docket text modified on 1/30/2019 to correct the Judge who signed the Order) (jak) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary Leon Webster. (Fee of $400 not received; Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis not filed)(jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Leon Webster. (jak) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#13

(#13) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary Leon Webster re #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Motion for Copies, and Notice of Change of Address. (fjg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#14

(#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gary Leon Webster re #6 Order and IFP Application. (jak) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall either submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff an IFP application and calculation sheet. The Clerk shall also forward a copy of this Order to the Business Office and Warden of the Ouachita River Unit. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/2019. (jak) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary Leon Webster re #4 Response. Resent to updated address. (fjg) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#11

(#11) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 02/06/2019. (lmc) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. Plaintiff's present custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/6/2019. (jak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE by Gary Leon Webster re #3 Order. (jak) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing Webster to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an IFP motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Plaintiff's #2 Motion to appoint counsel is denied without prejudice at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/20/2018. (jak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #15 Plaintiff's third Motion to Appoint Counsel, for the reasons set forth in the Court's January 30, 2019 Order #9 . The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/15/19. (pdw) Docket text modified on 2/15/2019 to correct typographical error. (kbc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gary Leon Webster re #6 Order and IFP Application. (jak) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary Leon Webster re #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Motion for Copies, and Notice of Change of Address. (fjg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. Plaintiff's present custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/6/2019. (jak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 02/06/2019. (lmc) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the Judge who signed the Order as Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney as marked on the document. (jak) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to appoint counsel and granting #8 Motion for copies. The Clerk is directed to forward to Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeromy T. Kearney on 1/30/2019. (jak) (Docket text modified on 1/30/2019 to correct the Judge who signed the Order) (jak) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Copies, and NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster. (jak) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary Leon Webster re #4 Response. Resent to updated address. (fjg) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall either submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff an IFP application and calculation sheet. The Clerk shall also forward a copy of this Order to the Business Office and Warden of the Ouachita River Unit. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/2019. (jak) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE by Gary Leon Webster re #3 Order. (jak) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing Webster to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an IFP motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Plaintiff's #2 Motion to appoint counsel is denied without prejudice at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/20/2018. (jak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Leon Webster. (jak) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary Leon Webster. (Fee of $400 not received; Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis not filed)(jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.