This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:00 (UTC).

Weathers v. Wu

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Weathers filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Wu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05817

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lamon Weathers

Defendant

Dr. Wu

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Lamon Weathers. (Exhibits, Envelope not post marked) (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff has not addressed the statutory filing fee for this case and his facially-deficient complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. To proceed with this action, by 11/16/2018, Plaintiff must: (1) address the filing fee for this action, either by (a) paying the $400 statutory filing fee or (b) submitting a properly completed and signed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified trust fund account statement for the proper time; (2) submit a signed amended complaint as explained below; and (3) submit a separate completed USM-285 service form for each Defendant named in the amended complaint, without which they cannot be served. Failure to comply with this order by 11/16/2018 will result in summary dismissal of this lawsuit. Along with a copy of this order, the Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, an amended complaint form and instructions, and a USM-285 service form. Plaintiff must promptly submit a change-of address notification if he is released or transferred, or this action will be subject to dismissal. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/5/2018. Mailed notice (tt, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 9/18/2018 (nsf, ). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Correction for #3 document entered on incorrect case. (nsf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILED plaintiff copy of order dated 10/5/18 #5 , an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, an amended complaint form and instructions, and a USM-285 service form. (tt, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff has not addressed the statutory filing fee for this case and his facially-deficient complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. To proceed with this action, by 11/16/2018, Plaintiff must: (1) address the filing fee for this action, either by (a) paying the $400 statutory filing fee or (b) submitting a properly completed and signed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified trust fund account statement for the proper time; (2) submit a signed amended complaint as explained below; and (3) submit a separate completed USM-285 service form for each Defendant named in the amended complaint, without which they cannot be served. Failure to comply with this order by 11/16/2018 will result in summary dismissal of this lawsuit. Along with a copy of this order, the Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, an amended complaint form and instructions, and a USM-285 service form. Plaintiff must promptly submit a change-of address notification if he is released or transferred, or this action will be subject to dismissal. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/5/2018. Mailed notice (tt, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Correction for #3 document entered on incorrect case. (nsf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 9/18/2018 (nsf, ). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Lamon Weathers. (Exhibits, Envelope not post marked) (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less