This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:58:37 (UTC).

WB Music Corp. et al v. TRM Hospitality LLC

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 WB Music Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against TRM Hospitality LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl W. Hoffman and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02147

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carl W. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MilkSongs

Realsongs

Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.

WB Music Corp.

Defendants

TRM Hospitality LLC

James H. Murphy

TRM Hospitality LLC doing business as Legends Sports Bar & Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Guy Kanute

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

50 W. Liberty St., Ste. 510

Reno, NV 89501-1961

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 AO 121 Copyright Report addressed to Register of Copyrights. (Re-Sent Document to same address) (JM) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WB Music Corp., Realsongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., MilkSongs re #1 Complaint,,. James H. Murphy served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Kanute, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WB Music Corp., Realsongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., MilkSongs re #1 Complaint,,. TRM Hospitality LLC served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Kanute, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MilkSongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Realsongs, WB Music Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for WB Music Corp. added. (Kanute, Nathan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#3

(#3) AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

1 #4

Summons James H. Murphy

1 #3

Summons TRM Hospitality LLC d/b/a Legends Sports Bar & Grill

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Schedule A - Copyright Infringement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5313872) by WB Music Corp., Realsongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., MilkSongs. Proof of service due by 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Copyright Infringement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons TRM Hospitality LLC d/b/a Legends Sports Bar & Grill, #4 Summons James H. Murphy)(Kanute, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 AO 121 Copyright Report addressed to Register of Copyrights. (Re-Sent Document to same address) (JM) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WB Music Corp., Realsongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., MilkSongs re #1 Complaint,,. James H. Murphy served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Kanute, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WB Music Corp., Realsongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., MilkSongs re #1 Complaint,,. TRM Hospitality LLC served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Kanute, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MilkSongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Realsongs, WB Music Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for WB Music Corp. added. (Kanute, Nathan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5313872) by WB Music Corp., Realsongs, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., MilkSongs. Proof of service due by 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Copyright Infringement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons TRM Hospitality LLC d/b/a Legends Sports Bar & Grill, #4 Summons James H. Murphy)(Kanute, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milksongs is a litigant

Latest cases where Ray Vaughan Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WB Music Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan Guy Kanute