This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 00:36:16 (UTC).

WB Music Corp., et al v. Solitaire Holdings, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 WB Music Corp , filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Solitaire Holdings, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-09450

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Baby Spike Music

North Avenue Music

Pure Love Music

Herbilicious Music

Naughty Music

Neutral Gray Music

WB Music Corp.

Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.

Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.

Defendants

Long Kim Huot

Solitaire Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sharon Douglass Mayo

Cassandra Eva Havens

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Notice

#16

(#16) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Notice) (iv) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following no later than FEBRUARY 8, 2019 as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Responses to Complaint by Defendants, or applications for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Naughty Music, Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., North Avenue Music, Herbilicious Music, Baby Spike Music, Neutral Gray Music, WB Music Corp., Pure Love Music, upon Defendant Long Kim Huot served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Long Kim Huot in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Schedule A

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Notice) (iv) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following no later than FEBRUARY 8, 2019 as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Responses to Complaint by Defendants, or applications for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Naughty Music, Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., North Avenue Music, Herbilicious Music, Baby Spike Music, Neutral Gray Music, WB Music Corp., Pure Love Music, upon Defendant Long Kim Huot served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Long Kim Huot in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Naughty Music, Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., North Avenue Music, Herbilicious Music, Baby Spike Music, Neutral Gray Music, WB Music Corp., Pure Love Music, upon Defendant Solitaire Holdings, LLC served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rey Ortega, Day Shift Manager, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-9450 MWF (AFMx). (esa) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/3/2018) (esa). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other), #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Documents No.5. The correct event is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendants Long Kim Huot, Solitaire Holdings, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Cassandra E. Havens re Summons Request, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA E. HAVENS REGARDING JOINDER OF MULTIPLE COPYRIGHT CLAIMS filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22707712 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Naughty Music, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., North Avenue Music, Herbilicious Music, Baby Spike Music, Neutral Gray Music, WB Music Corp., Pure Love Music. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Baby Spike Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Herbilicious Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Naughty Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Neutral Gray Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party North Avenue Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Pure Love Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party WB Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.(pty:pla))(Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less