This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2018 at 03:20:26 (UTC).

Waymo, LLC v. Uber Technologies, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 Waymo, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Uber Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-MC-24560

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Waymo, LLC

Defendants

Uber Technologies, LLC

Otto Trucking, LLC

Ottomotto, LLC

In Re

Craig Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lance August Harke

Attorney at Harke Clasby & Bushman LLP

9699 Ne Second Avenue

Miami Shores, FL 33138

In Re Attorneys

Ryan K. Stumphauzer

Attorney at Stumphauzer & Sloman, PLLC

One Se Third Ave., Suite 1820

Miami, FL 33131

Jorge A Perez Santiago

Attorney at Stumphauzer Sloman PLLC

One Se Third Ave., Suite 1820

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/20/2017. (EGT) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#8

(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Third Party EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition on December 21, 2017 in California filed by Craig Clark. (Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

6 #6

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

6 #5

Exhibit 5

6 #4

Exhibit 4

6 #3

Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Third Party EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition on December 21, 2017 in California filed by Waymo, LLC. Attorney Lance August Harke added to party Waymo, LLC(pty:pla). Replies due by 12/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harke, Lance) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

3 #5

Certification Emergency Motion

3 #4

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Affidavit 3 - Howitson Declaration

3 #2

Affidavit 2 - Clark Declaration

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Copy of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition

#3

(#3) Third Party EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition on December 21, 2017 in California by Craig Clark. Responses due by 1/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition, #2 Affidavit 2 - Clark Declaration, #3 Affidavit 3 - Howitson Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certification Emergency Motion)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

1 #2

Affidavit Exh. 2 - Clark Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit Exh. 1 - Copy of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition

#1

(#1) Non Party Craig Clark's EMERGENCY Motion (Complaint) to Quash and Stay Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in California on December 21, 2017. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-10265456, filed by Craig Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Copy of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition, #2 Affidavit Exh. 2 - Clark Declaration, #3 Affidavit Exh. 3 - Howitson Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) Modified text on 12/18/2017 (jc). (Entered: 12/18/2017)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • (#10) Administrative Order. As no further proceedings or filings have been made following the Court's discovery order on the motion to quash, this miscellaneous action may now be Closed.Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/22/2018. (EGT) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/20/2017. (EGT) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Third Party EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition on December 21, 2017 in California filed by Craig Clark. (Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER expediting Reply in support of #3 Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoena. Upon review of the response and supporting materials, good cause exists to expedite the movant's reply, which shall address why the deposition cannot proceed in this District on December 22, 2017, and why substantive or time limitations should be Ordered if the motion is granted with respect to the date and location of the deposition.Movant's Reply due by 12:00 p.m., EST, December 20, 2017.Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/19/2017. (EGT) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Third Party EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition on December 21, 2017 in California filed by Waymo, LLC. Attorney Lance August Harke added to party Waymo, LLC(pty:pla). Replies due by 12/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harke, Lance) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER expediting response to #3 Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoena. Upon review of the record on the motion, the Court finds good cause to grant expedited treatment and Order Plaintiff in the underlying action to file its response in this District by 3:00 p.m., EST, December 19, 2017. For that purpose, the Court grants counsel for Plaintiff leave to file the response on the Court docket without filing a motion for pro hac vice appearance.To enforce this Order, counsel for the movant is DIRECTED to serve a PDF copy of this Order upon Plaintiff and all other interested parties via email.Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/18/2017. (EGT) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, the motion to quash and stay subpoena #1 , #3 and all matters in the case are REFERRED to United States Magistrate Edwin G. Torres to take all necessary and proper action as required by law. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/18/2017. (eft) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Third Party EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition on December 21, 2017 in California by Craig Clark. Responses due by 1/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition, #2 Affidavit 2 - Clark Declaration, #3 Affidavit 3 - Howitson Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certification Emergency Motion)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (jc) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Non Party Craig Clark's EMERGENCY Motion (Complaint) to Quash and Stay Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in California on December 21, 2017. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-10265456, filed by Craig Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Copy of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition, #2 Affidavit Exh. 2 - Clark Declaration, #3 Affidavit Exh. 3 - Howitson Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) Modified text on 12/18/2017 (jc). (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otto Trucking LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Waymo LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance A. Harke