This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2021 at 06:58:38 (UTC).

Waymo LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 Waymo LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and William Alsup. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00939

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Waymo LLC

Petitioners

Edward Russo

Nicholas Gicinto

Richard Jacobs

Defendants and Intervenors

Uber Technologies, Inc

Ottomotto LLC

Otto Trucking LLC

Uber Technologies, Inc.

John Gardner

Respondent

Stroz Friedberg, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Colin Sebern

Ognen Stojanovski

Tyto LiDAR, LLC

Intervenors

Bloomberg L.P.

The Hearst Corporation

John Gardner

BuzzFeed, Inc.

Associated Press

MediaNews Group, Inc.

Interested Parties

Travis Kalanick

Slack, Inc.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Kramer Verhoeven

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Andrew Perlson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Felipe Corredor

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Grant Nicholas Margeson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

James Dubois Judah

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

John M. Neukom

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Avenue, Suite 1400

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Jordan Ross Jaffe

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

50 California St, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Melissa J Baily

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Arturo J. Gonzalez

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Daniel Pierre Muino

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20037

Eric Akira Tate

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew Ian Kreeger

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Michael A. Jacobs

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Rudolph Kim

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

755 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Wendy Joy Ray

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Camila Alicia Tapernoux

Attorney at Morrison and Foerester

425 Market Street, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joshua Nathanial Friedman

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

1401 New York Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Esther Kim Chang

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Noah Matthew Jennings

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

Marc J. Pernick

Attorney at Mauriel Kapouytian Woods LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 480

San Francisco, CA 94111

124 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2738

#2737

#2736

#2735

2734 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

2734 #1

Declaration of Debra Grassgreen

#2734

#2733

2726 #8

Declaration of Debra Grassgreen Ex F

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

#2

#4

#5

#6

10,188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2738) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael A. Jacobs (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2737) ORDER GRANTING #2734 UNOPPOSED SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER MODIFYING PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2736) Statement of Non-Opposition re #2734 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order / Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Supplemental Motion to Modify Interim Protective Order filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) #2734 ) (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2735) Proposed Order re #2734 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order / Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Supplemental Motion to Modify Interim Protective Order / Order Approving Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Supplemental Motion to Modify Interim Protective Order by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Grassgreen, Debra) (Filed on 1/14/2021) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2734) Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order / Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Supplemental Motion to Modify Interim Protective Order filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/28/2021. Replies due by 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Debra Grassgreen, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Grassgreen, Debra) (Filed on 1/14/2021) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2733) ORDER MODIFYING PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2732) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2020 by AT&T Conference line re #2726 MOTION Modify the Interim Model Protective Order. The Court heard oral arguments and took the motion under submission.Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Jordan Jaffe. Defendant Attorney: Katharine Ciliberti. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2020) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2731) ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #2730 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Katharine R. Ciliberti. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2730) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15309271.) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ciliberti, Katharine) (Filed on 12/11/2020) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2729) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #2726 Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Modify the Interim Model Protective Order) - Reply in Support of Motion to Modify the Interim Model Protective Order filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Bradford, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Grassgreen, Debra) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2,746 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Otto Trucking LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) (Entered: 02/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) (Entered: 02/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Waymo LLC.. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/27/2017) (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • (#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/10/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017) (Entered: 02/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Waymo LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/23/2017) (Entered: 02/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Waymo LLC Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 and FRCP 7.1 (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/23/2017) (Entered: 02/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/23/2017) (Entered: 02/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/23/2017) (Entered: 02/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/23/2017) (Entered: 02/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of Defense of Trade Secret Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Otto Trucking LLC, Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-11180330.). Filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/23/2017) Modified on 2/28/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otto Trucking LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Stroz Friedberg, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MediaNews Group, Inc. is a litigant