Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:36:59 (UTC).

Watts v. Solvay USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Watts filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Solvay USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are James K. Bredar and Ellen L. Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02658

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James K. Bredar

Ellen L. Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Watts

Defendant

Solvay USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gilbert F Shelsby, Jr

Attorney at Shelsby and Leoni

221 Main Street

Wilmington, DE 19804

Michael I Silverman

Attorney at Silverman McDonald and Freidman

1010 N Bancroft Pkwy Ste 22

Wilmington, DE 19805

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth A Hafey

Attorney at Miles & Stockbridge, P.C.

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Elizabeth M Greenwald

Attorney at Miles and Stockbridge PC

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting Defendant Solvay USA Inc.'s #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases ELH-18-2455 and JKB-18-2658; directing 18-2455 shall be designated as the lead case. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/24/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael I. Silverman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7569754.) by David Watts(Shelsby, Gilbert) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Scheduling Order

#9

(#9) Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) Local Rule - Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 103(5) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hafey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Solvay USA, Inc..(Hafey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by David Watts (Shelsby, Gilbert) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#5) Correspondence re: Defendant's Statement Concerning Removal (Hafey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/28/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement-Disclosure of Corporate Affiliation and Financial Interest of Defendant Solvay USA, Inc. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE- Defendants Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #3

State Court Information Report

1 #2

State Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-004344-OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637108589), filed by Solvay USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Information Report)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • Telephone Status Conference held on 9/25/2018 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (1:18-cv-02455-ELH). (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting Defendant Solvay USA Inc.'s #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases ELH-18-2455 and JKB-18-2658; directing 18-2455 shall be designated as the lead case. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/24/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Chief Judge James K. Bredar no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Solvay USA, Inc.(Hafey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael I Silverman. Directing attorney Michael I Silverman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael I. Silverman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7569754.) by David Watts(Shelsby, Gilbert) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Local Rule - Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 103(5) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hafey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Solvay USA, Inc..(Hafey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by David Watts (Shelsby, Gilbert) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Correspondence re: Defendant's Statement Concerning Removal (Hafey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/28/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement-Disclosure of Corporate Affiliation and Financial Interest of Defendant Solvay USA, Inc. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE- Defendants Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-004344-OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637108589), filed by Solvay USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Information Report)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solvay USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael I Silverman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gilbert F. Shelsby