This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2018 at 07:52:56 (UTC).

Watterson v. Consumer Reports, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Watterson filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Consumer Reports, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00513

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Watterson

Defendant

Consumer Reports, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter N. Wasylyk

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter N. Wasylyk

1307 Chalkstone Avenue

Providence, RI 02908

Joseph I Marchese

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10119

Philip L. Fraietta

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher. P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10119

Defendant Attorneys

Natalie J. Spears

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 5900

Chicago, IL 60606

William M. Gantz

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

101 Federal Street, Suite 2750

Boston, MA 02110

Kristen C. Rodriguez

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • TEXT ORDER granting (11) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 11/30/18 (and approving briefing schedule for responses and replies to any filed Motion to Dismiss) in case 1:18-cv-00513-WES-PAS; granting (7) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 11/30/18 (and approving briefing schedule for responses and replies to any filed Motion to Dismiss) in case 1:18-cv-00520-WES-PAS. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/7/2018. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristen C. Rodriguez. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/31/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Natalie J. Spears. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/31/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Stipulated Briefing Schedule filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (Gantz, William) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Kristen C. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1282124 ) filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Gantz, William) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Natalie J. Spears to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1282120 ) filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Gantz, William) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Reset Deadlines: Consumer Reports, Inc. answer due 11/7/2018. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/12/2018. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph I Marchese. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Philip L. Fraietta. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Gantz on behalf of Consumer Reports, Inc. (Gantz, William) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Watterson. Consumer Reports, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1262749 ), filed by Robert Watterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1262749 ), filed by Robert Watterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Consumer Reports, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip L. Fraietta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter N. Wasylyk

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph I Marchese