This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2018 at 07:21:03 (UTC).

Watterson v. Consumer Reports, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 Watterson filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Consumer Reports, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Seibel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-08001

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Seibel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Watterson

Defendant

Consumer Reports, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Ignatius Marchese

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Ave.,

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Consumer Reports, Inc.. Document filed by Robert Watterson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consumer Reports, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-02444 (KMK). Document filed by Robert Watterson.(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Consumer Reports, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Watterson. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15521279)Document filed by Robert Watterson.(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Consumer Reports, Inc.. Document filed by Robert Watterson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 16cv2444 and declined by Judge Kenneth M Karas and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consumer Reports, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Ignatius Marchese. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 16CV2444. (pne) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-02444 (KMK). Document filed by Robert Watterson.(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Consumer Reports, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Watterson. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15521279)Document filed by Robert Watterson.(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Consumer Reports, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph I Marchese