This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 07:36:04 (UTC).

Watkins v. Watson et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Watkins filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Watson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan O. Hickey and James R. Marschewski. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06097

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

Referral Judge

James R. Marschewski

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franklin Watkins

Arkadelphia, AR 71923

Defendants

Sergeant Sam Burnett

Jailer Joe Love

Sheriff Jason Watson

Jailer Andrew Reginald

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER adopting in toto #5 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 30, 2018. (mjm) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked return to sender, including #5 Report and Recommendations. No new address available. (lw) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Franklin Watkins. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski on November 5, 2018. (hnc) Modified on 11/26/2018 to edit signing Judge information (hnc). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished to Plaintiff. (mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: certification regarding inmate funds. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 11, 2018. (mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Franklin Watkins. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Sam Burnett, Joe Love, Andrew Reginald, Jason Watson, filed by Franklin Watkins.(mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER adopting in toto #5 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 30, 2018. (mjm) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked return to sender, including #5 Report and Recommendations. No new address available. (lw) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Franklin Watkins. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski on November 5, 2018. (hnc) Modified on 11/26/2018 to edit signing Judge information (hnc). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Not Deliverable as Addressed, not an address. Mail originally sent to Franklin Watkins at Clark County Jail including #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Franklin Watkins, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #3 Order Provisionally Filing Complaint. No new address available. New Address due by 11/21/2018. (hnc) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished to Plaintiff. (mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: certification regarding inmate funds. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 11, 2018. (mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Franklin Watkins. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Sam Burnett, Joe Love, Andrew Reginald, Jason Watson, filed by Franklin Watkins.(mjm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.