This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:11 (UTC).

Washington v. DuBois et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Washington filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against DuBois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colleen McMahon and Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-07783

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Colleen McMahon

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Eric Washington

Goshen, NY 10924

Defendants

Piper L.

Carl E. DuBois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Karen D. Edelman-Reyes

Attorney at New York County District Attorney's Office

One Hogan Place

New York, NY 10013

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Piper L. served on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Service was accepted by LC PIPER #536. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington. (vba) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#5

(#5) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sc) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Defendants L. Piper, Shield #536, and Orange County Sheriff Carl E. DuBois, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauper is status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (As further set forth in this Order.) USM-285 Form due by 10/15/2018. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 10/15/2018. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/13/2018) (cf) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington. (sc) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#4

Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Updated Prisoner Authorization, to Kenneth Eric Washington ID No. 2018-03374 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Road Goshen, NY 10924. (vba) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#9

(#9) FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Kenneth Eric Washington at Orange county Jail 110 Wells Farm Road, Goshen, NY 10924, on 9/13/2018 Re: #8 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sbr) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Carl E. DuBois, Piper L. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

4 #1

Prisoner Authorization

#3

(#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Kenneth Eric Washington ID No. 2018-03374 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Road Goshen, NY 10924; The Superintendent Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Road Goshen, NY 10924. (vba) Modified on 9/10/2018 (vba). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Kenneth Washington on 10/19/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Carl E. DuBois, Piper L.. (Edelman-Reyes, Karen) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen D. Edelman-Reyes on behalf of Carl E. DuBois, Piper L.. (Edelman-Reyes, Karen) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Kenneth Washington on 10/19/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Carl E. DuBois, Piper L.. (Edelman-Reyes, Karen) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen D. Edelman-Reyes on behalf of Carl E. DuBois, Piper L.. (Edelman-Reyes, Karen) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Piper L. served on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Service was accepted by LC PIPER #536. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington. (vba) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington. (sc) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Kenneth Eric Washington at Orange county Jail 110 Wells Farm Road, Goshen, NY 10924, on 9/13/2018 Re: #8 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sbr) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 09/13/2018 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Carl E. DuBois, L. Piper. (sbr) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl E. DuBois, Piper L.. (sbr) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Defendants L. Piper, Shield #536, and Orange County Sheriff Carl E. DuBois, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauper is status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (As further set forth in this Order.) USM-285 Form due by 10/15/2018. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 10/15/2018. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/13/2018) (cf) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Kenneth Eric Washington ID No. 2018-03374 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Road Goshen, NY 10924; The Superintendent Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Road Goshen, NY 10924. (vba) Modified on 9/10/2018 (vba). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/6/2018) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sc) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Updated Prisoner Authorization, to Kenneth Eric Washington ID No. 2018-03374 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Road Goshen, NY 10924. (vba) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DIRECTING UPDATED PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 9/26/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/27/2018) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization)(keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Carl E. DuBois, Piper L. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kenneth Eric Washington.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less