This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 08:06:38 (UTC).

Washington County, Tennessee v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Washington County, Tennessee filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00205

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals,Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc

Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.

Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Michael Jay Fuller

Attorney at McHugh Fuller Law Group, PLLC

97 Elias Whiddon Road

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Peter J Mougey

Attorney at Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A

316 S. Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

J Burton LeBlanc

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C.

3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

R Edison Hill

Attorney at Hill, Peterson, Carper, Bee & Deitzler, PLLC

500 Tracy Way

Charleston, WV 25311

Paul T Farrell, Jr

Attorney at Greene, Ketchum, Farrell, Bailey & Tweel, LLP

P.O. Box 2389

Huntington, WV 25724

Anthony J Majestro

Attorney at Powell & Majestro, PLLC

405 Capitol Street, Suite P-1200

Charleston, WV 25301

Crystal Goan Jessee

Attorney at Jessee Law Office

P.O. Box 1537

Greeneville, TN 37745

Thomas C Jessee

Attorney at Jessee & Jessee

P O Box 997

Johnson City, TN 37605

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -69) transferring MDL case to the Northern District of Ohio. (JCK) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/20/2018. (SAC, )Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/20/2018. (SAC, )Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/20/2018. (SAC, )Order mailed to Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (SAC, )Notice mailed. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #2

Other CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM

1 #1

Civil CoverSheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3821800.), filed by Washington County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Civil CoverSheet, #2 Other CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • Case transferred from Tennessee Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-46317, filed 12/11/18. (AMP) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Case transferred to the District of the Northern District of Ohio. (JCK) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -69) transferring MDL case to the Northern District of Ohio. (JCK) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/20/2018. (SAC, )Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/20/2018. (SAC, )Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/20/2018. (SAC, )Order mailed to Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Attorneys Majestro, LeBlanc, Farrell, Mougey and Hill. (SAC, )Notice mailed. (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (SAC, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3821800.), filed by Washington County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Civil CoverSheet, #2 Other CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.