This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 07:37:42 (UTC).

Warmack v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 Warmack filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00783

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Warmack

Defendants

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Atrium Medical Corporation

Getinge AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D. Todd Mathews

Attorney at Gori Julian & Associates PC

156 N Main St

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Enjolique D. Aytch

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

Hugh J. Turner, Jr.

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#11

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Grasher on behalf of Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Getinge USA, Inc., Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft).(Grasher, David) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#10

(#5) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#10

(#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. Todd Mathews on behalf of Andrew Warmack (Mathews, D.) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #4

Waiver of Service

1 #3

Waiver of Service

1 #2

Waiver of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1702937 filed by Andrew Warmack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Waiver of Service)(Mathews, D.) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting (953) Assented to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines in case 1:16-md-02753-LM and the respective pleading in the underlying civil cases. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Grasher on behalf of Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Getinge USA, Inc., Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft).(Grasher, David) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for Tuesday, 10/23/2018 at 2:00 PM EST before Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CANCELLED. At the request of parties' lead counsel, the Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 3:00 PM EST is cancelled.(de) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting (876) Motion to Extend Time JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE in case 1:16-md-02753-LM and the respective pleading in the underlying civil cases. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • ENDORSED ORDER re: 875 Notice of Subpoena in 16-md-2753-LM. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • MDL 2753: Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-783-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. Todd Mathews on behalf of Andrew Warmack (Mathews, D.) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1702937 filed by Andrew Warmack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Waiver of Service)(Mathews, D.) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maquet Cardiovascular US, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Atrium Medical Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D. Todd Mathews