This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2019 at 08:01:57 (UTC).

Ward v. IDOC et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Ward filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against IDOC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00508

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glen Jones Ward

Boise, ID 83707

Defendants

R Valley

W Wilson

J Keller

K Hinkle

IMSI

IDOC

Eliason

R Brett

J Linder

A Barroso

MDTT

J Tamez

L Watson

Corizon

K Brown

L Barry

B Rayburn

Unknown Officers/Agents/Administrative & Custodial Trustees

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

3 #1

Exhibits/Attachments to Complaint

3 #2

Attachments continued

3 #3

Attachments continuedf

3 #4

Attachments continued

3 #5

Mailed Approval Notice

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT of Glen Jones Ward. Granting #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glen Jones Ward (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (cc: Director of the Idaho Department of Correction Attn: Inmate Accounts, 1299 N Orchard, Suite 110, Boise ID 83706)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to the Court to Take Judicial Notice and Requests to Clarify ( Responses due by 1/17/2019)by Plaintiff Glen Jones Ward. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#5) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Continuance of Discovery, Based upon Further Delay and Subsequent Replies to Formal Communicationsby Plaintiff Glen Jones Ward. Responses due by 12/6/2018 (jp) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Glen Jones Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits/Attachments to Complaint, #2 Attachments continued, #3 Attachments continued, #4 Attachments continued, #5 Mailed Approval Notice)(jp) (due to poor scan quality, located in expando in the Clerk's Office-jp). (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen Jones Ward. (jp) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Glen Jones Ward. Responses due by 12/6/2018 (jp) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eliason is a litigant

Latest cases where IMSI is a litigant

Latest cases where IDOC is a litigant

Latest cases where Corizon LLC is a litigant