Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2019 at 07:41:56 (UTC).

Wang v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 Wang filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Omni Hotels Management Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles S. Haight, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02000

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles S. Haight, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hui Wang

Defendant

Omni Hotels Management Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael P. Foley, Jr.

Attorney at Michael P. Foley, Jr., P.C.

1120 South Main Street

Cheshire, CT 06410

Defendant Attorneys

Lori A. Wirkus

Attorney at FlynnWirkusYoung, P.C.

400 Crown Colony, Suite 601, Po Box 699242

Quincy, MA 02269

Eli Jason Scott Mackeu

Attorney at Setliff Law, PC

4940 Dominion Boulevard

Glen Allen, VA 23060

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hui Wang. (Foley, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Eli Jason Scott Mackeu on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Mackeu, Eli Jason) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

13 #2

Affidavit of Lori A. Wirkus in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

13 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of C. Stephen Setliff

#13

(#13) MOTION for Attorney(s) C. Stephen Setliff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5100096) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of C. Stephen Setliff, #2 Affidavit of Lori A. Wirkus in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

12 #2

Affidavit of Lori A. Wirkus in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

12 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eli Jason Mackey

#12

(#12) MOTION for Attorney(s) Eli Jason S. Mackey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5100064) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eli Jason Mackey, #2 Affidavit of Lori A. Wirkus in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Foley, Jr on behalf of Hui Wang (Foley, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Omni Hotels Management Corporation re #5 Electronic Service Documents, Statement in Response to Standing Order 5-1 on Removed Cases (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation.(Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori A. Wirkus on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Omni Hotels Corporation for Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#6

(#6) EXHIBIT C.A. Cover Sheet by Omni Hotels Management Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

5 #1

Standing Order on Removals

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B - notice of removal state court

1 #1

Exhibit A - state court pleadings

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hui Wang. (Foley, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Eli Jason Scott Mackeu on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Mackeu, Eli Jason) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) C. Stephen Setliff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 1/3/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eli Jason S. Mackey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 1/3/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Attorney(s) C. Stephen Setliff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5100096) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of C. Stephen Setliff, #2 Affidavit of Lori A. Wirkus in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Attorney(s) Eli Jason S. Mackey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5100064) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eli Jason Mackey, #2 Affidavit of Lori A. Wirkus in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Foley, Jr on behalf of Hui Wang (Foley, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Omni Hotels Management Corporation re #5 Electronic Service Documents, Statement in Response to Standing Order 5-1 on Removed Cases (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation.(Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori A. Wirkus on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Omni Hotels Corporation for Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXHIBIT C.A. Cover Sheet by Omni Hotels Management Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 12/6/2018.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019 Discovery due by 6/7/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2019 Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Omni Hotels Management Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Omni Hotels Management Corporation from Superior Court, J.D. of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV19-6086968-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5077334, filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - notice of removal state court)(Wirkus, Lori) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Foley, Jr.