This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 15:29:42 (UTC).

Walsh et al v. Janssen Research & Development, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 Walsh filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Janssen Research Development, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-09416

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cindy Walsh

Thomas Walsh

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Company

Bayer Healthcare LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Research & Development LLC

Bayer AG

Bayer HealthCare AG

Bayer Pharma AG

Bayer Corporation

Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Ortho LLC

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceuticals Research and Development, LLC

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Dirk Calache Haarhoff

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

199 Water Street, Suite 2500

New York, NY 10038

David M. Covey

Attorney at Sedgwick, Detert, Moran & Arnold (New York)

125 Broad Street, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

23 #1

*Restricted*

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit B7

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit B6

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit B5

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit B4

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B3

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-06804. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (jls) (Entered: 10/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Louisiana. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/19/2017) (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC and Johnson & Johnson and Affirmative Defenses served on Thomas Walsh and Cindy Walsh on September 14, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company.(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer and Additional Defenses of Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Plaintiff's Complaint served on Thomas Walsh and Cindy Walsh on September 14, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer and Additional Defenses of Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC to Plaintiff's Complaint served on Thomas Walsh and Cindy Walsh on September 14, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC.(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer and Additional Defenses of Defendant Bayer Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint served on Thomas Walsh and Cindy Walsh on September 14, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bayer Corporation. (Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bayer Corporation.(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (kl) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Exhibits; Civil Cover Sheet and Rider; Notice of Appearance; Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement; Defendant Bayer HealthCare LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1; Defendant Bayer Corporation's Initial Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1; Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1; and Related Case Statement served on Thomas Walsh and Cindy Walsh on September 7, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:16-cv-01088-RA. Document filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NippoNex Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer Medical Care Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer West Coast Corporation, Corporate Parent Bayer Essure, Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Dr. Scholl's LLC, Corporate Parent Coppertone LLC, Corporate Parent MiraLAX LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer Healthcare US Funding LLC, Other Affiliate Bayer AG, Other Affiliate Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Other Affiliate Schering Berlin Inc., Other Affiliate Bayer Corporation, Other Affiliate Bayer World Investments B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer US Holding LP, Other Affiliate Bayer Solution B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Bayer Pharmaceuticals AG, Other Affiliate Bayer East Coast LLC for Bayer Healthcare LLC. Document filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC.(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Schering Berlin Inc., Other Affiliate Bayer AG, Other Affiliate Bayer Corporation, Other Affiliate Bayer World Investments B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer US Holding LP, Other Affiliate Bayer Solution B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC for Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bayer US Holding LP, Other Affiliate Bayer AG, Other Affiliate Bayer World Investments B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer Solution B.V. for Bayer Corporation. Document filed by Bayer Corporation.(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Corporate Parent OMJ PR Holdings for Janssen Ortho LLC; Corporate Parent Centocor Research & Development, Inc. for Janssen Research & Development, LLC. Document filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rider)(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dirk Calache Haarhoff on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Haarhoff, Dirk) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 156162/2017. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14098174).Document filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Corporation, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Ortho LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B7)(Covey, David) [Transferred from nysd on 10/17/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant