This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2018 at 07:32:28 (UTC).

Walls v. Coe

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Walls filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Coe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colin Stirling Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03214

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nirin Walls

Hillsboro, IL 62049

Defendant

. Coe

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT entered. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#12

(#12) MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 9/24/2018. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. section 1915A. This case is closed. This dismissal shall count as a strike in the three strike log. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#14

(#14) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/18/2018 1:56:11 PM ]. File Size [ 1169 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:26 ]. (admin). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Letter from Plaintiff regarding his IFP status (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#9

(#9) Letter from Clerk of the Court sent to Graham Correctional Center requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) VIDEO WRIT issued for Merit Review Hearing set for 9/18/2018 at 1:30 p.m Writ faxed to Graham and Concordia. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#6

(#6) Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers from Plaintiff's prior place of incarceration, Pinckneyville CC. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Nirin Walls.(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Nirin Walls. Responses due by 9/13/2018 (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

2 #1

Notice regarding Privacy

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice regarding Privacy)(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against. Coe, filed by Nirin Walls. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT entered. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 9/24/2018. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. section 1915A. This case is closed. This dismissal shall count as a strike in the three strike log. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/18/2018 1:56:11 PM ]. File Size [ 1169 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:26 ]. (admin). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 9/18/2018 granting #4 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Based on the Plaintiff`s trust fund ledgers and his testimony in Court indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/18/2018 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by the Plaintiff Nirin Walls by video conference. Merit Review Hearing held. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. Plaintiff questioned regarding his trust fund account. Motion #4 is GRANTED and no initial partial filing fee is due. (Tape #UR-C: 1:56PM.) (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Nirin Walls (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Plaintiff regarding his IFP status (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Clerk of the Court sent to Graham Correctional Center requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Nirin Walls (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) VIDEO WRIT issued for Merit Review Hearing set for 9/18/2018 at 1:30 p.m Writ faxed to Graham and Concordia. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 9/4/2018. A merit review hearing is set for September 18, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., by video conference from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's video appearance at this merit review hearing.(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers from Plaintiff's prior place of incarceration, Pinckneyville CC. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Nirin Walls (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Nirin Walls.(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Nirin Walls. Responses due by 9/13/2018 (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice regarding Privacy)(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against. Coe, filed by Nirin Walls. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less