This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2018 at 02:34:17 (UTC).

Wallis v. Sherry et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 Wallis filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Sherry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are P. K. Holmes, III and Mark E. Ford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02005

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes, III

Referral Judge

Mark E. Ford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Wallis

Newport, AR 72112

Defendants

Daniel Shue

Jason Hunter

Christina Sherry

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Plaintiff. (hnc) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Laura Wallis.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support of #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:17-cv-00781. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/9/2018. (mcz) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case he must either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP Application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/20/2017. (mcz) (Docket text modified on 12/21/2017 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(hnc) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Plaintiff. (hnc) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (hnc) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:17-cv-00781. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/9/2018. (mcz) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support of #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case he must either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP Application" as marked on the Order.(jak) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case he must either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP Application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/20/2017. (mcz) (Docket text modified on 12/21/2017 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Laura Wallis.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Wallis. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.