This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2018 at 07:22:19 (UTC).

Wallace et al v. C.R. England, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Wallace filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against C R England, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01204

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Craig Wallace

Mary McNutt

Defendants

C.R. England, Inc.

Does 1 through 10

C.R. England, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua H Haffner

Defendant Attorney

Justo Gonzalez

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant C.R. England, Inc (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/19/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/26/2018, Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. Noting Date 9/5/2018, (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justo Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) C.R. England, Inc. (DJ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#2

(#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Mary McNutt, Craig Wallace (Haffner, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) C.R. England, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5436769) Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Mary McNutt(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Craig Wallace(pty:pla), filed by Craig Wallace, Mary McNutt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haffner, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant C.R. England, Inc (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/19/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/26/2018, Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pursuant to the parties' #6 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, Defendant shall have up to and including 10/17/2018 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the original complaint. (VE) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. Noting Date 9/5/2018, (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justo Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) C.R. England, Inc. (DJ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Judge Richard A. Jones added. (DJ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Mary McNutt, Craig Wallace (Haffner, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) C.R. England, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5436769) Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Mary McNutt(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Craig Wallace(pty:pla), filed by Craig Wallace, Mary McNutt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haffner, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less