This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2018 at 07:50:21 (UTC).

WALKER v. AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 WALKER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOE L. WEBSTER and WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00634

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEAN STEPHEN WALKER

Sophia, NC 27350

Defendants

MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC.

PAUL SONNTAG

AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC..

FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC

INTRANSIT, LLC

DAVID HARTMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES M. DEDMAN, IV

Attorney at GALLIVAN WHITE & BOYD, P.A.

One Morrocroft Centre, 6805 Morrison Blvd., Ste. 200

Charlotte, NC 28211

JOSEPH N. GROSS

Attorney at BENESCH, FRIEDLANDER, COPLAN & ARONOFF, LLP

200 Public Square, Ste. 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

DAVID M. KRUEGER

Attorney at BENESCH, FRIEDLANDER, COPLAN & ARONOFF, LLP

200 Public Square, Ste. 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Exhibit

#21

(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by INTRANSIT, LLC, AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, PAUL SONNTAG, DAVID HARTMAN, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., filed by SEAN STEPHEN WALKER. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#20

(#20) Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond to #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#19

(#19) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#18

(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG. Response to Motion due by 9/17/2018 (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

17 #4

Exhibit N

17 #3

Exhibit M

17 #2

Exhibit L

17 #1

Exhibit K

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Transport, Inc.. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES M. DEDMAN, IV on behalf of Defendants American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

1 #6

Certificate of Service

1 #5

Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court

1 #4

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Paul Sonntag

1 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of David Hartman

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2389833.), filed by David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag, American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David Hartman, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Paul Sonntag, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court, #6 Certificate of Service)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by INTRANSIT, LLC, AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, PAUL SONNTAG, DAVID HARTMAN, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., filed by SEAN STEPHEN WALKER. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond to #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG. Response to Motion due by 9/17/2018 (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by SEAN STEPHEN WALKER against defendant All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N) (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH N. GROSS on behalf of Defendants AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG (GROSS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID M. KRUEGER on behalf of Defendants AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG (KRUEGER, DAVID) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.., FLEET SOLUTIONS, LLC, DAVID HARTMAN, INTRANSIT, LLC, MARATHON TRANSPORT, INC., PAUL SONNTAG of Filing of Acknowledgment of State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of State Court, #2 Certificate of Service)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag. Response to Motion due by 8/13/2018 (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag re #7 MOTION to Compel and Stay Case Pending Arbitration and in the Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Hartman)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Compel and Stay Case Pending Arbitration and in the Alternative Motion to Transfer by American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2018 Response to Motion due by 8/13/2018 (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fleet Solutions, LLC. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intransit, LLC. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Transport, Inc.. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Transport, Inc.. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES M. DEDMAN, IV on behalf of Defendants American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC, David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2389833.), filed by David Hartman, Intransit, LLC, Marathon Transport, Inc., Paul Sonntag, American Transport, Inc., Fleet Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David Hartman, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Paul Sonntag, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court, #6 Certificate of Service)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Transporters, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph N Gross

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Krueger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James M. Dedman, IV