This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2018 at 07:40:36 (UTC).

Waldenberg v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 Waldenberg filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Waldenberg

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anne E. Sherwood

Attorney at MORRISON, SHERWOOD, WILSON & DEOLA, PLLP

401 N Last Chance Gulch, Po Box 557

Helena, MT 59624

Frederick F. Sherwood

Attorney at MORRISON, SHERWOOD, WILSON & DEOLA, PLLP

401 N Last Chance Gulch, Po Box 557

Helena, MT 59624

Defendant Attorney

Michelle L. Gomez

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON - DENVER

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#8

7 #4

Summons Returned Served

7 #3

State Court Issued Summons

7 #2

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7 #1

State Court Docket Sheet

#7

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#5

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Nancy Waldenberg. (Sherwood, Frederick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Nancy Waldenberg. (Sherwood, Frederick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. ALL PARTIES will appear by telephone for the November 7, 2018 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Court will contact the parties with the call in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/17/2018. (MMS) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Nancy Waldenberg. (Sherwood, Frederick) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Preliminary Pretrial Conference By Telephone Michelle L. Gomez appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • (#10) TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is set for 11/7/2018 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2018. (SLL) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of the 10/24/2018 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The 10/24/2018 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is hereby vacated, and will be rescheduled by the Court. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2018. (TLO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Remark; Attorney Anne Sherwood is now a registered user (TLO) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on shelf in Great Falls Clerk's Office. (ACC) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Nancy Waldenberg. (ACC) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 State Court Issued Summons, #4 Summons Returned Served) (ACC) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #5 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Michelle L. Gomez appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/17/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/17/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/17/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/12/2018. (ACC) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Anne Sherwood re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Sherwood. (SLR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2189976 (TLO) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Montana Eighth Judicial District, case number BDV-18-0321., filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne E. Sherwood