This case was last updated from PACER on 06/17/2020 at 06:29:05 (UTC).

Wahmhoff v. Fifth Third Bank

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 Wahmhoff filed an Other lawsuit against Fifth Third Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00431

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Wahmhoff

Defendant

Fifth Third Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sergei Lemberg

Attorney at Lemberg Law LLC

43 Danbury Rd., 3Rd Fl.

Wilton, CT 06897

Defendant Attorney

Jason M. Renner

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

900 Wilshire Dr., Ste. 300

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting PROPOSED STIPULATED ORDER of dismissal #16 ; this matter is dismissed with prejudice and without costs; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Kenneth Wahmhoff (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 10/31/2017)

#15

(#15) ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 11/20/2017; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 09/21/2017)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: early settlement conference set for 1/30/2018 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fifth Third Bank identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 08/23/2017)

#10

(#10) ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report consistent with this Order by 9/5/2017; the Court will then issue a Case Management Order; the parties shall file a notice if a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is necessary; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#7

(#8) ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; Defendant's answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 8/14/2017; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall, no later than 7/26/2017, move for an entry of default against Defendant or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Fifth Third Bank served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017 (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL: Plaintiff to complete service of process within 90 days after the filing of the complaint or a verified petition RE: Service of Process to be filed by 8/8/2017, or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Fifth Third Bank (ems) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#9) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting PROPOSED STIPULATED ORDER of dismissal #16 ; this matter is dismissed with prejudice and without costs; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Kenneth Wahmhoff (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 11/20/2017; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 09/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: early settlement conference set for 1/30/2018 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fifth Third Bank identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 08/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report consistent with this Order by 9/5/2017; the Court will then issue a Case Management Order; the parties shall file a notice if a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is necessary; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jason M. Renner on behalf of defendant Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; Defendant's answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 8/14/2017; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendant Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jason M. Renner on behalf of defendant Fifth Third Bank (Renner, Jason) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall, no later than 7/26/2017, move for an entry of default against Defendant or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Fifth Third Bank served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017 (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL: Plaintiff to complete service of process within 90 days after the filing of the complaint or a verified petition RE: Service of Process to be filed by 8/8/2017, or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Fifth Third Bank (ems) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kenneth Wahmhoff in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3841528 (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Fifth Third Bank filed by Kenneth Wahmhoff (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less