This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2018 at 07:50:36 (UTC).

Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc. v. EQT Production Company

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 Waco Oil Gas Co , Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EQT Production Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc.

Defendant

EQT Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth E. Webb, Jr.

Attorney at Bowles, Rice, McDavid, Graff & Love - Charleston

Po Box 1386, 600 Quarrier St.

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

Marc A. Monteleone

Attorney at Bowles, Rice, McDavid, Graff & Love

Po Box 1386, 600 Quarrier St.

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

George A. Patterson, III

Attorney at Bowles, Rice, McDavid, Graff & Love - Charleston

Po Box 1386, 600 Quarrier St.

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

Defendant Attorneys

Brian R. Swiger

Attorney at Jackson Kelly PLLC - Charleston

1600 Laidley Tower, Po Box 553, 500 Lee Street, E.

Charleston, WV 25301

Wendy Glover Adkins

Attorney at Jackson Kelly, PLLC - Morgantown

Po Box 619

Morgantown, WV 26507-0619

Dale H. Harrison

Attorney at Jackson Kelly, PLLC - Morgantown

Po Box 619

Morgantown, WV 26507-0619

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING JOINT #9 MOTION TO VACATE SCHEDULING ORDER, VACATING SCHEDULING ORDER AND ENTERING MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder & Amendments due by 1/2/2019. Discovery due by 6/3/2019. Motions due by 7/10/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2019. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/29/2019 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. All deadlines contained in the scheduling order of October 9, 2018 are hereby VACATED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/17/18. (lmm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Vacate #8 Scheduling Order,, by Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc.. (Webb, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#8

(#8) VACATED PURSUANT TO #10 ORDER --- SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2018. Discovery due by 1/14/2019. Motions due by 1/28/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2019. Pretrial Conference /Final Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 4/30/2019 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/9/18. (soa) Modified on 10/17/2018 to vacate order(lmm). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Webb, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc.. (Webb, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#5

(#5) EQT Production Company's ANSWER to Complaint by EQT Production Company.(Adkins, Wendy) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

(#4) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/26/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2018. Discovery due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 8/23/18. (lmm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQT Production Company. (Adkins, Wendy) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EQT Production Company. (lmm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Wetzel County Circuit Clerk, (case number 18-C-47), filed by EQT Production Company. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2651378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING JOINT #9 MOTION TO VACATE SCHEDULING ORDER, VACATING SCHEDULING ORDER AND ENTERING MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder & Amendments due by 1/2/2019. Discovery due by 6/3/2019. Motions due by 7/10/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2019. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/29/2019 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. All deadlines contained in the scheduling order of October 9, 2018 are hereby VACATED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/17/18. (lmm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION to Vacate #8 Scheduling Order,, by Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc.. (Webb, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) VACATED PURSUANT TO #10 ORDER --- SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2018. Discovery due by 1/14/2019. Motions due by 1/28/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2019. Pretrial Conference /Final Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 4/30/2019 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/9/18. (soa) Modified on 10/17/2018 to vacate order(lmm). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Webb, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc.. (Webb, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EQT Production Company's ANSWER to Complaint by EQT Production Company.(Adkins, Wendy) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/26/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2018. Discovery due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 8/23/18. (lmm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQT Production Company. (Adkins, Wendy) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EQT Production Company. (lmm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Wetzel County Circuit Clerk, (case number 18-C-47), filed by EQT Production Company. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2651378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less