This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2019 at 07:56:41 (UTC).

W.-Jeremiah:Jones v. State of Virginia

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 W -Jeremiah Jones filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against State of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady, Theresa Carroll Buchanan and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01597

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

Presiding Judges

Liam O'Grady

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W.-Jeremiah:Jones

Defendant

State of Virginia

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER that Jones's complaint be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/22/19. (c/s: pltf)(pmil, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

3 #1

Cover Letter-Envelope

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to State of Virginia; served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter-Envelope)(pmil, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued and mailed to Plaintiff- pro se for service of process as to Defendant State of Virginia (dest, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

1 #10

Receipt

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Virginia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683076320.), filed by W.-Jeremiah:Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Receipt)(dest, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER that Jones's complaint be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/22/19. (c/s: pltf)(pmil, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge Liam O'Grady no longer assigned to the case. (rban, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to State of Virginia; served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter-Envelope)(pmil, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued and mailed to Plaintiff- pro se for service of process as to Defendant State of Virginia (dest, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State of Virginia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683076320.), filed by W.-Jeremiah:Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Receipt)(dest, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less