This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 07:43:47 (UTC).

Vongboupha v. Flores

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Vongboupha filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Flores. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01154

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Vongboupha

Defendant

Matthew A Flores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie C. Nixon

Attorney at Nixon Vogelman Barry Slawsky & Simoneau PA

77 Central St

Manchester, NH 03101

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Darling

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

6 Kimball Ln, Ste 200

Lynnfield, MA 01940

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with jury demand filed by Matthew A Flores.(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew A Flores with jury demand filed by William Vongboupha.(Nixon, Leslie) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Matthew A Flores. (Darling, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit Amended Complaint

#4

(#4) Assented to MOTION to Amend filed by William Vongboupha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Nixon, Leslie) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-CV-935, Rockingham County Superior Court(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Matthew A Flores.(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet

1 #4

Letter of Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk

1 #3

Notice of Filing Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-00935 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1745141) filed by Matthew Flores. Answer Follow Up on 1/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #3 Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Letter of Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with jury demand filed by Matthew A Flores.(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Deadline terminated: Pretrial Conference 01/23/2019 cancelled. Order to issue. (de) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew A Flores with jury demand filed by William Vongboupha.(Nixon, Leslie) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion to Amend using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2019.(gla) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Matthew A Flores. (Darling, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/16/2019.(de) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Assented to MOTION to Amend filed by William Vongboupha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Nixon, Leslie) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-CV-935, Rockingham County Superior Court(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/14/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ej) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1154-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Matthew A Flores.(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-00935 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1745141) filed by Matthew Flores. Answer Follow Up on 1/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #3 Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Letter of Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Darling, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less