This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2020 at 07:05:32 (UTC).

Volvo Group North America, LLC v. Truck Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2018 Volvo Group North America, LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Truck Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth K. Dillon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Volvo Group North America, LLC

Volvo Group North America, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Volvo Trucks North America

Intervenor Plaintiff

Kenworth Truck Company

Defendants

Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.

James E Hartman

Truck Enterprises, Inc.

Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.

Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Anne Scully

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Billy Martin Donley

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002-6111

David Ray Jarrett

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002-6111

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Alison K. Eggers

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Two Seaport Lane, Suite 300

Boston, MA 02210

Edward Victor Arnold

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

975 F Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20004-1454

James Chafel McGrath

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Two Seaport Lane, Suite 300

Boston, MA 02210

Defendant Attorneys

Brad Darin Weiss

Attorney at Charapp & Weiss, LLP

8180 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1000

Mclean, VA 22102

Mark Bowman Callahan

Attorney at Clark & Bradshaw, P.C.

92 North Liberty Street

Harrisonburg, VA 22802

Michael G. Charapp

Attorney at Charapp & Weiss, LLP

8180 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1000

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

#68

66 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#66

#65

64 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#64

#62

61 #2

Exhibit B

61 #1

Exhibit A

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit 12, Part 2

1 #14

Exhibit 12, Part 1

1 #13

Exhibit 11

1 #12

Exhibit 10

1 #10

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Exhibit 5, Part 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/3/2020. (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket(#67) Oral ORDER LIFTING STAY. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on June 3, 2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint as to all Defendants by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER granting #64 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/19/2020. (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) MOTION to Stay (Agreed) by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Status Conference set for February 12, 2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone conference call before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Response re #61 Notice (Other) Request for Dismissal . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC of Material Event (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jarrett, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Order Referring Case for Mediation before the Honorable J. Michael Gamble. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/10/2019. (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) CONSENT to Mediation by Volvo Group North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Referral to Mediation)(Jarrett, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Volvo Group North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Correction: Changed viewingrestriction of Attachment 1, to #5 Motion; only viewable by court personnel.Document correctly filed at Document #7 Brief/Memorandum in Support by counsel. (sas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Billy M. Donley and David R. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Billy Martin Donley and David Ray Jarrett for Volvo Group North America, LLC added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/31/18. (sas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Scully, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for David R. Jarrett and Billy M. Donley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Scully, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Volvo Group North America, LLC. Amendment to #2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement (Scully, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 summons - James E. Hartman, #2 summons - Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., #3 Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., #4 summons - Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.)(sas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volvo Group North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aktiebolaget Volvo, OMX Nordic Exchange, Sweden for Volvo Group North America, LLC. (sas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.,receipt #0423-2828005), filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 5, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5, Part 3, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, Part 1, #15 Exhibit 12, Part 2, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truck Enterprises, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Kenworth Truck Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Volvo Group North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alison K. Eggers