This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 07:06:57 (UTC).

Volkswagen AG et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 Volkswagen AG filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marvin E. Aspen and Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06611

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Marvin E. Aspen

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Volkswagen AG

Audi AG

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Kids Limited

hug the earth

rebeopoch

carhua20175

krstore88

sky_town

Auto Home

miaofa668

CarNuoC Automobile Store

oldlove

mjszyouth0131

Car LED Lights

hotlife07

xia1005

tanck

7.5043

181 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Other Attorneys

Daliah Saper

Attorney at Saper Law Offices

505 N. Lasalle, #350

Chicago, IL 60654

Matthew Richard Grothouse

Attorney at Saper Law Offices, Llc

505 North Lasalle, Suite 350

Chicago, IL 60614

 

Court Documents

#61

RESTRICTED

#60

(#60) EXHIBIT by Defendant Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 Redacted Exhibit 1 regarding sur-reply, #50 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#59

RESTRICTED

#58

(#58) EXHIBIT by Defendants Defendants No. 70 and No. 90, Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 regarding supplement #46 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

50 #4

Declaration Declaration of Wing Lim Pang

50 #3

Declaration Declaration of Yongjian Zhang

50 #2

Declaration Declaration of Hammond Wang

50 #1

Exhibit 1

#50

(#60) EXHIBIT by Defendant Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 Redacted Exhibit 1 regarding sur-reply, #50 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #3

Schedule A

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#9) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/13/2018 (pk, ). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 Unredacted Exhibit 1 regarding exhibit #60 , sur-reply, #50 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) EXHIBIT by Defendant Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 Redacted Exhibit 1 regarding sur-reply, #50 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 regarding supplement #46 , exhibit #58 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) EXHIBIT by Defendants Defendants No. 70 and No. 90, Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 regarding supplement #46 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Notice of Severance Decision by Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 (Saper, Daliah) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #34 as to Defendants No. 70 and No. 90. Defendants' motion to file sealed sales records #51 is granted, with a public redacted version also to be filed by 11/16/2018 (redacting names, addresses, and products, but leaving the zip codes and sales numbers). As discussed during the hearing, the preliminary injunction as to Defendants No. 70 and Defendant No. 90 is vacated. PayPal shall lift the restraint on the account holding Defendants 70's and 90's funds. As explained during the hearing, under Rule 20(a)(2), joinder is improper as to these two Defendants is not proper. The generic similarities amongst the almost 200 Defendants are insufficient to establish that the "right to felief... aris[es] out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences." The relevant factors are the nature of the claims, the legal basis for recovery, the law at issue, and the factual background. Ross v. Bd. of Educ., 486 F.3d 279, 284 (7th Cir. 2007). In this case, the inquiry boils down to whether all the Defendants are properly pled to be working together or in a coordinated effort, and the generic and conclusory similarities do not adequately plead that type of connection. Based on the adversarial presentation of Defendants 70 and 90, they will be severed from this case under Rule 21. On 11/14/2018, defense counsel reported to the courtroom deputy that the two Defendants are willing to be joined in one case, even though joinder is questionable as to those two Defendants as well. The Clerk is directed to open a new case, place the complaint on that docket ****but listing as named Defendants only Defendant hkseller*2011 and Defendant ledilluminant. The case will be randomly assigned. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee for the new case. As to the remaining Defendants, status hearing set for 12/13/2018 at 9:00 a.m. If the remaining Defendants are in default as of 12/10/2018, then Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default judgment on 12/10/2018 and notice it for presentment at the next status hearing date and time. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/08/2018 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Order Number: 32763. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, CSR, RMR, CRR, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 435-6047. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2019. (McGuigan, Gale) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) RESPONSE by Defendant Defendants No. 70 and No. 90 to declaration #52 (Grothouse, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) NOTICE by Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re declaration #52 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/13/2018 (pk, ). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jk, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jk, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Audi AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Volkswagen AG, Audi AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15003188. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kids Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases where Audi AG is a litigant