This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/25/2018 at 07:36:44 (UTC).

Vogel v. D & D Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Vogel filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against D D Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael D. Nelson and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barry W Vogel

Barry W. Vogel

Defendants

D&D Foods, Inc.

D & D Foods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas R. Novotny

Attorney at NOVOTNY LAW FIRM

18025 Oak Street, Suite B

Omaha, NE 68130

Defendant Attorney

Torrey J. Gerdes

Attorney at BAYLOR, EVNEN LAW FIRM

1248 O Street, Suite 600, Wells Fargo Center

Lincoln, NE 68508

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Rule 26(f) Planning Conference Report Scheduling Letter #8 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant D & D Foods, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Hy-Vee, Inc., Corporate Parent Hy-Vee, Inc. for D & D Foods, Inc.. by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants D & D Foods, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by D & D Foods, Inc. (Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#4

(#4) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant D & D Foods, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Barry W Vogel from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-7301 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3773063) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of D&D Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend. The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is extended to 11/27/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Rule 26(f) Planning Conference Report Scheduling Letter #8 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant D & D Foods, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Hy-Vee, Inc., Corporate Parent Hy-Vee, Inc. for D & D Foods, Inc.. by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants D & D Foods, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by D & D Foods, Inc. (Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to October 10, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant D & D Foods, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant D&D Foods, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • (#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Barry W Vogel from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-7301 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3773063) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of D&D Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gerdes, Torrey) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Torrey L. J. Gerdes