This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 07:59:38 (UTC).

Voeks et al v. Allied Interstate LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Voeks filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Allied Interstate LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01567

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Troy Norton

Julie Voeks

Marlene Kanehl

Joseph Fote

Defendant

Allied Interstate LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark A Eldridge

Attorney at Ademi & O'Reilly LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/15/2018. The plaintiff's motion to stay further proceedings is granted #3 . The parties are relieved from the automatic briefing schedule set forth in Civil Local Rule 7(b) and (c). For administrative purposes, it is necessary that the Clerk terminate the plaintiff's motion for class certification #3 . However, this motion will be regarded as pending to serve its protective purpose under Damasco. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Certify Class (Damasco, Campbell-Ewald), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from memorandum, supporting documents, and automatic briefing requirements, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion for class certification until the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by Joseph Fote, Marlene Kanehl, Troy Norton, Julie Voeks. (Eldridge, Mark)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Joseph Fote, Marlene Kanehl, Troy Norton, Julie Voeks. (Eldridge, Mark)

1 #18

Summons

1 #14

Exhibit N:Letter from creditor

1 #13

Exhibit M: Billing statement

1 #12

Exhibit L: Letter from Defendant

1 #11

Exhibit K: Billing statement

1 #10

Exhibit J:Letter from creditor

1 #9

Exhibit I: Billing statement

1 #8

Exhibit H: Letter from Defendant

1 #7

Exhibit G: Billing statement

1 #5

Exhibit E: Billing statement

1 #3

Exhibit C: Billing statement

1 #2

Exhibit B: Letter from creditor

1 #1

Exhibit A: Billing statement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Allied Interstate LLC by Troy Norton, Joseph Fote, Julie Voeks, Marlene Kanehl. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2937188) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Billing statement, #2 Exhibit B: Letter from creditor, #3 Exhibit C: Billing statement, #4 Exhibit D: Letter from Defendant, #5 Exhibit E: Billing statement, #6 Exhibit F:Letter from creditor, #7 Exhibit G: Billing statement, #8 Exhibit H: Letter from Defendant, #9 Exhibit I: Billing statement, #10 Exhibit J:Letter from creditor, #11 Exhibit K: Billing statement, #12 Exhibit L: Letter from Defendant, #13 Exhibit M: Billing statement, #14 Exhibit N:Letter from creditor, #15 Exhibit O: Billing statement, #16 Exhibit P: Letter from Defendant, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Summons)(Eldridge, Mark) (Attachment 17 replaced on 10/5/2018) (jcl).

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joseph Fote, Marlene Kanehl, Troy Norton, Julie Voeks. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Eldridge, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/15/2018. The plaintiff's motion to stay further proceedings is granted #3 . The parties are relieved from the automatic briefing schedule set forth in Civil Local Rule 7(b) and (c). For administrative purposes, it is necessary that the Clerk terminate the plaintiff's motion for class certification #3 . However, this motion will be regarded as pending to serve its protective purpose under Damasco. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Allied Interstate LLC. (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Certify Class (Damasco, Campbell-Ewald), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from memorandum, supporting documents, and automatic briefing requirements, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion for class certification until the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by Joseph Fote, Marlene Kanehl, Troy Norton, Julie Voeks. (Eldridge, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Joseph Fote, Marlene Kanehl, Troy Norton, Julie Voeks. (Eldridge, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Allied Interstate LLC by Troy Norton, Joseph Fote, Julie Voeks, Marlene Kanehl. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2937188) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Billing statement, #2 Exhibit B: Letter from creditor, #3 Exhibit C: Billing statement, #4 Exhibit D: Letter from Defendant, #5 Exhibit E: Billing statement, #6 Exhibit F:Letter from creditor, #7 Exhibit G: Billing statement, #8 Exhibit H: Letter from Defendant, #9 Exhibit I: Billing statement, #10 Exhibit J:Letter from creditor, #11 Exhibit K: Billing statement, #12 Exhibit L: Letter from Defendant, #13 Exhibit M: Billing statement, #14 Exhibit N:Letter from creditor, #15 Exhibit O: Billing statement, #16 Exhibit P: Letter from Defendant, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Summons)(Eldridge, Mark) (Attachment 17 replaced on 10/5/2018) (jcl).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.