This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 20:19:21 (UTC).

Vineyard Vines, LLC v. Dazzle Up, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 Vineyard Vines, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Dazzle Up, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Vineyard Vines, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Dazzle Up, LLC dba Simply Southern Tees

Dazzle Up, LLC

Dazzle Up, LLC doing business as Simply Southern Tees

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Larry Currell Jones

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

101 S. Tryon Street, Suite 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Uly Samuel Gunn, III

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Northwest

Atlanta, GA 30309

Sarah Parker LaFantano

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W. Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David William Sar

Attorney at Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey & Leonard, L.L.P.

P.O. Box 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420

Amanda Marie Whorton

Attorney at Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey & Leonard LLP

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite #1700

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Vineyard Vines, LLC.(Jones, Larry) Modified text on 4/19/2018 (brl). (Entered: 04/18/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Uly Samuel Gunn, III for Vineyard Vines, LLC ; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sarah Parker LaFantano for Vineyard Vines, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/2/18. (tob) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Parker LaFantano Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3645248. by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Jones, Larry). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 03/31/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Uly Samuel Gunn Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3645247. by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Jones, Larry). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 03/31/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Marie Whorton on behalf of Dazzle Up, LLC (Whorton, Amanda) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David William Sar on behalf of Dazzle Up, LLC (Sar, David) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dazzle Up, LLC (Sar, David) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Vineyard Vines, LLC by Dazzle Up, LLC.(Sar, David) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vineyard Vines, LLC (Jones, Larry) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (brl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2018: #1 Complaint) (brl). (Entered: 03/05/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Dazzle Up, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dazzle Up, LLC dba Simply Southern Tees with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3615940), filed by Vineyard Vines, LLC.(Jones, Larry) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/8/2018. (brl) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Vineyard Vines, LLC.(Jones, Larry) Modified text on 4/19/2018 (brl). (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Notice to Sarah Parker LaFantano: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/9/2018. (tob) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Uly Samuel Gunn, III for Vineyard Vines, LLC ; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sarah Parker LaFantano for Vineyard Vines, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/2/18. (tob) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Parker LaFantano Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3645248. by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Jones, Larry). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 03/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Uly Samuel Gunn Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3645247. by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Jones, Larry). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 03/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Marie Whorton on behalf of Dazzle Up, LLC (Whorton, Amanda) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David William Sar on behalf of Dazzle Up, LLC (Sar, David) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dazzle Up, LLC (Sar, David) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Vineyard Vines, LLC by Dazzle Up, LLC.(Sar, David) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vineyard Vines, LLC (Jones, Larry) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (brl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2018: #1 Complaint) (brl). (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Dazzle Up, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dazzle Up, LLC dba Simply Southern Tees with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3615940), filed by Vineyard Vines, LLC.(Jones, Larry) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dazzle Up, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Vineyard Vines, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID WILLIAM SAR