This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2018 at 07:43:37 (UTC).

Vielleux v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 Vielleux filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J P Stadtmueller and Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01625

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J P Stadtmueller

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gina M. Vielleux

Gina M Vielleux

Defendants

ALDI Inc.

Group Policy Number LK - 961017

Life Insurance Company of North America

ALDI Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brianna M Covington

Attorney at Alan C Olson & Associates SC

2880 S Moorland Rd

New Berlin, WI 53151-3744

Alan C Olson

Attorney at Alan C Olson & Associates SC

2880 S Moorland Rd

New Berlin, WI 53151-3744

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Keenan Ryan

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2600

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4115

David J Hanus

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2600

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4115

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/3/2018. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Hanus, David)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) STIPULATION for Second Extension of Time to File an Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanus, David)

#12

(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 11/16/2018. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)

#11

(#11) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Gina M Vielleux. (Covington, Brianna)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 11/13/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel K. Ryan (Ryan, Daniel)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina M Vielleux. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 10/17/2018. (Covington, Brianna)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Gina M. Vielleux. (Covington, Brianna)

1 #4

Summons Group Policy Number LK - 961017

1 #3

Summons ALDI Inc.

1 #2

Summons Life Insurance Company of North America

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/26/2018 ADOPTING #8 Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time and Dismissal of Parties. Defendants ALDI Inc. and Group Policy Number LK-961017 are dismissed from this action; Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint by 11/23/2018. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 12/4/2018. This case has been reassigned to me on the consent of the parties. I will adopt the dates set at the Scheduling Conference held on November 16, 2018 as reflected in the court minutes (Docket # 12). (cc: all counsel)(llc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/3/2018. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hanus, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than 12/17/2018; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Hanus, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION for Second Extension of Time to File an Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanus, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 11/16/2018. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Gina M Vielleux. (Covington, Brianna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 11/13/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/26/2018 ADOPTING #8 Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time and Dismissal of Parties. Defendants ALDI Inc. and Group Policy Number LK-961017 are dismissed from this action; Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint by 11/23/2018. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hanus on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Hanus (Hanus, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel K. Ryan (Ryan, Daniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina M Vielleux. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 10/17/2018. (Covington, Brianna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gina M Vielleux. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Covington, Brianna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Gina M. Vielleux. (Covington, Brianna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Gina M. Vielleux. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2943762) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Life Insurance Company of North America, #3 Summons ALDI Inc., #4 Summons Group Policy Number LK - 961017)(Covington, Brianna)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.