This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:38:37 (UTC).

Vesey v. Envoy Air, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2018 Vesey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Envoy Air, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sara Darrow and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04124

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ciara Vesey

Defendants

Envoy Air, Inc.,

Envoy Air, Inc., doing business as American Eagle Airllines, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carla D. Aikens

Attorney at Carla D. Aikens, P.C.

615 Griswold Street, Suite 709

Detroit, MI 48226

Carla D Aikens

Attorney at CARLA D AIKENS P.C.

Suite 709, 615 Griswold

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie J Quincy

Attorney at QUARLES & BRADY LLP

2 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Lindsay Jo Fiore

Attorney at QUARLES & BRADY LLP

Two North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

21 #1

*Restricted*

#21

#20

#19

#18

16 #4

Exhibit D

16 #3

Exhibit C

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01084. . (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division the electronic record. (lf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/25/2018. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's motion to transfer venue #7 is granted. Enter Order. This case is transferred to the Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division. All pending dates and motions are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY by Defendant Envoy Air, Inc., to response in opposition to motion #16 , motion to transfer case #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE by Ciara Veseyin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Envoy Air, Inc., to transfer case #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Aikens, Carla) (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Ciara Vesey regarding Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot(MIDP),,, #3 Plaintiff's Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (Aikens, Carla) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Service Regarding Defendant's Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Protocol by Stephanie J Quincy on behalf of Envoy Air, Inc., (Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Envoy Air, Inc.,(Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Response to the motion to transfer case #7 is due 6/1/2018 reply, if any, is due 6/8/2018. Ruling set for 6/29/2018 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to contact chambers prior thereto to inquire whether they need to appear. Motion to adjourn scheduling conference until after ruling on the motion to transfer #9 is granted. No appearances required on 5/21/18 or 6/8/18. Mailed notice (np, ) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant Envoy Air, Inc., to continue Scheduling Conference (Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie J Quincy for presentment of motion to transfer case #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/21/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Envoy Air, Inc., to transfer case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B)(Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Envoy Air, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Envoy Air, Inc.,(Quincy, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 6/8/2018 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26 planning report re MIDP due 6/6/2018. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, ) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (meg, ) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ciara Vesey by Carla D. Aikens (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aikens, Carla) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ciara Vesey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14109938. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Aikens, Carla) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVOY AIR INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carla D. Aikens