This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:53 (UTC).

Verges v. USA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Verges filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine D. Perry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01448

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine D. Perry

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stephon Verges

Lewisburg, PA 17837

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Thomas J. Mehan

Attorney at OFFICE OF U.S. ATTORNEY

111 S. Tenth Street, 20Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) Document treated as, "MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255" by Petitioner Stephon Verges. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DLB) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct illegal sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 is DENIED. Rule 4 of the Rules Governing 2255 Proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a Certificate of Appealability. 28 U.S.C. 2253. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/2018. (CBL) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

3 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send movant a 2255 form and a copy of the docket sheet in his criminal case, United States v. Verges, Case No. 4:13-CR-461-CDP (E.D. Mo.). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall show cause, in writing and no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, why the instant 2255 motion should not be dismissed as time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if movant fails to comply with this Order, his 2255 motion will be dismissed without further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/30/18. (Copy of form, criminal docket sheet and this order sent to petitioner on 8/30/18). (EAB) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#3

(#3) AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Stephon Verges. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KXS) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Order sent to party not electronically notified this date. Mon Oct 15 10:44:48 CDT 2018 (Long, Carol) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct illegal sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 is DENIED. Rule 4 of the Rules Governing 2255 Proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a Certificate of Appealability. 28 U.S.C. 2253. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/2018. (CBL) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Stephon Verges. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KXS) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send movant a 2255 form and a copy of the docket sheet in his criminal case, United States v. Verges, Case No. 4:13-CR-461-CDP (E.D. Mo.). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall show cause, in writing and no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, why the instant 2255 motion should not be dismissed as time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if movant fails to comply with this Order, his 2255 motion will be dismissed without further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/30/18. (Copy of form, criminal docket sheet and this order sent to petitioner on 8/30/18). (EAB) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Aug 29 16:00:43 CDT 2018 (admin,) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (DLB) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Document treated as, "MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255" by Petitioner Stephon Verges. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DLB) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.