This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2018 at 09:21:40 (UTC).

Venadium LLC v. Blain Supply, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 Venadium LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Blain Supply, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00882

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Venadium LLC

Defendant

Blain Supply, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary Katherine Schulz

Attorney at Media Litigation Firm, P.C.

1144 E. State Street, Suite A260

Geneva, IL 60134

Defendant Attorney

John C. Scheller

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

P.O. Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Stipulation of Dismissal

#11

(#11) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal) (lak) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#8

(#8) Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline by Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by John C. Scheller for Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Venadium LLC. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

#5

(#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (voc) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Venadium LLC. (voc) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Venadium LLC. (Schulz, Mary) Modified on 11/21/2017: Case number. Certificate of Service is undated. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Venadium LLC. (Schulz, Mary) Modified on 11/20/2017: Case number. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

1 #4

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B - Claims Chart

1 #2

Exhibit A - Patent 6330549

1 #1

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Blain Supply, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2145692.), filed by Venadium LLC, (Attachments: #1 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #2 Exhibit A - Patent 6330549, #3 Exhibit B - Claims Chart, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schulz, Mary) Modified on 11/20/2017: Case number. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal) (lak) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (voc) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Blain Supply, Inc. answer due 1/18/2018. (voc) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/27/2017. (voc) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline by Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by John C. Scheller for Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Venadium LLC. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (voc) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Venadium LLC. (voc) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Case related to Cases Nos. 17-cv-880-wmc and 17-cv-881-wmc. (voc) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Venadium LLC. (Schulz, Mary) Modified on 11/21/2017: Case number. Certificate of Service is undated. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Venadium LLC. (Schulz, Mary) Modified on 11/20/2017: Case number. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Blain Supply, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2145692.), filed by Venadium LLC, (Attachments: #1 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #2 Exhibit A - Patent 6330549, #3 Exhibit B - Claims Chart, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schulz, Mary) Modified on 11/20/2017: Case number. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less