This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 15:19:50 (UTC).

Velarde De Cordova et al. v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 Velarde De Cordova filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph R. Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-04116

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph R. Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jill Tenbrink

Thelma T. Maldonado

Julie Davis

Maria Rojo

Sandra Hasty

Cathleen Paquette

Toni Lehman

Yolanda Binsberger

Leah Asch

Carrie Pennell

Elsa Valverde

Debra Brock

Dorothy Perin

Paula Shuman

Ruby Sanchez

Marcia Lafon

Barbara Davis

Tammy Klepper

Defendants

Boston Scientific Corporation

Doe Manufacturers

130 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer R. Liakos

Attorney at ROBINSON CALCAGNIE & ROBINSON

Seventh Floor, 620 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Mayela Carmen Montenegro

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

Suite 1600, 5 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614

Other Attorneys

Michael Laurence Mandell

Attorney at REED SMITH

Suite 2900, 355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

David E. Stanley

Attorney at REED SMITH

Suite 2900, 355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Natasha Sung

Attorney at REED SMITH

Suite 2900, 355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Case transferred to Southern District of West Virginia. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Southern District of West Virginia*. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (jjg) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • (#15) In light of the case being stayed the August 25, 2017 status conference is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/28/2017. (no document attached) (ecp) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Staying Case and Dismissing Claims Against Boston Scientific. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/27/2017. (jjg) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending A Transfer By The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stanley, David) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Maricarmen Velarde De Cordova (Liakos, Jennifer) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Nonresident Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Deanna Voss, #3 Declaration David E. Stanley)(Sung, Natasha) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • (#10) Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/25/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes re: status of transfer of these cases to MDL. This conference will be held for cases 17cv1249, 17cv1250, 17cv1251 and 17cv1253. Counsel must lodge a joint statement, no longer than 3 pages, by 8/17/17 re: status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/14/2017.(no document attached) (ecp) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Sung, Natasha) (jjg). (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. re #7 Answer to Complaint, (Stanley, David) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended ANSWER to Complaint by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stanley, David)Attorney David E Stanley added to party American Medical Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party American Medical Systems, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Astora Women's Health LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Health Solutions Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proof of Service)(Montenegro, Mayela)Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. of case(s) 3:17-cv-01250-JAH-JMA, 3:17-cv-01251-BEN-BLM, 3:17-cv-01253-WQH-NLS (AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASES). (Sung, Natasha) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, DOE Manufacturers, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (mxn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, DOE Manufacturers, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (mxn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, DOE Manufacturers, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (mxn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02017-00001706-CU-PL-CTL. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-10179194.), filed by Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, American Medical Systems, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Astora Holdings, LLC, DOE Manufacturers, American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration David Stanley, #3 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Answer, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:17-cv-01249-CAB-NLS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(mxn) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/5/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natasha Sung

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Laurence Mandell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Stanley