This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Vega, Alfredo et al v. Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 Vega, Alfredo filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00678

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alfredo Vega

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendants

Linda Alsum-O'Donovan

Lieutenant Anderson

Not Classified By Court

GBCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting plaintiff Alfredo Vega leave to proceed against Lieutenant Anderson and Linda Alsum-O'Donovan. Vega may have until October 22, 2018, to file a supplement to the complaint addressing his access-to-the-court claims. Service of the complaint is STAYED pending plaintiff's filing of a supplement to the complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/1/2018. (jef),(ps) Corrected docket text on 10/1/2018 (jef). (jef). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Alfredo Vega assessed an initial partial filing fee of $0.50 due 9/13/2018. Plaintiff's motion for use of release account funds to pay $0.50 initial partial payment, dkt. #4 , is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/22/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Supplement re: #8 Order by Plaintiff Alfredo Vega. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Anderson, Linda Alsum-O'Donovan filed by Alfredo Vega. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Adult Conduct Report 2662695, #2 Exhibit 2 - Open Records Request to Milwaukee Police Department, #3 Exhibit 3 - Index from Milwaukee County Circuit Court Case No. 1993CF934212 with handwritten dollar amounts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Photos from April 11, 2017 Incident, #5 Exhibit 5 - Complaint Number CCI-2017-10657) (nln) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

5 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#4

(#4) Motion for Use of Release Account Funds to Pay Filing Fee by Plaintiff Alfredo Vega. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Open Records Request to Milwaukee Police Department

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Photos from April 11, 2017 Incident

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alfredo Vega. (Attachments: #1 Authorization for Release of Institutional Account Information and Payment of the Filing Fee) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

2 #1

Authorization for Release of Institutional Account Information and Payment of t

#7

(#7) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Index from Milwaukee County Circuit Court Cae No. 1993CF934212 with

#3

RESTRICTED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Supplement re: #8 Order by Plaintiff Alfredo Vega. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting plaintiff Alfredo Vega leave to proceed against Lieutenant Anderson and Linda Alsum-O'Donovan. Vega may have until October 22, 2018, to file a supplement to the complaint addressing his access-to-the-court claims. Service of the complaint is STAYED pending plaintiff's filing of a supplement to the complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/1/2018. (jef),(ps) Corrected docket text on 10/1/2018 (jef). (jef). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 0.50, receipt number 34690032690. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Alfredo Vega assessed an initial partial filing fee of $0.50 due 9/13/2018. Plaintiff's motion for use of release account funds to pay $0.50 initial partial payment, dkt. #4 , is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/22/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for Use of Release Account Funds to Pay Filing Fee by Plaintiff Alfredo Vega. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Alfredo Vega. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alfredo Vega. (Attachments: #1 Authorization for Release of Institutional Account Information and Payment of the Filing Fee) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Anderson, Linda Alsum-O'Donovan filed by Alfredo Vega. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Adult Conduct Report 2662695, #2 Exhibit 2 - Open Records Request to Milwaukee Police Department, #3 Exhibit 3 - Index from Milwaukee County Circuit Court Case No. 1993CF934212 with handwritten dollar amounts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Photos from April 11, 2017 Incident, #5 Exhibit 5 - Complaint Number CCI-2017-10657) (nln) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.