This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:39:53 (UTC).

Vaughns, et al. v. Sunstone Cowboy Lessee, LP, et al.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Vaughns filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sunstone Cowboy Lessee, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02764

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RABIA VAUGHNS

DWAIN A VAUGHNS

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

LIFE FITNESS

SUNSTONE COWBOY LESSEE, LP D/B/A HOUSTON MARRIOTT NORTH

Brunswick Corporation

SUNSTONE COWBOY, LP

SUNSTONE COWBOY GP, LLC

SUNSTONE COWBOY LESSEE GP, LLC

MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.

SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph E Sampson

Attorney at McCathern, PLLC

3710 Rawlins, Ste 1600

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S Beckelman

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al

909 Fannin, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77010

Matthew Thomas McCracken

Attorney at Deans and Lyons LLP

1001 Fannin, Ste 1925

Houston, TX 77002

M. David Short

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

300 North Lasalle St, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60654-3406

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER on #10 Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice. Sunstone Cowboy GP, LLC, Sunstone Cowboy Lessee GP, LLC, Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. and Marriott International, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dwain A Vaughns, Rabia Vaughns, filed.(Sampson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Sunstone Cowboy GP, LLC, Sunstone Cowboy Lessee GP, LLC, Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. by Dwain A Vaughns, Rabia Vaughns, filed. (Sampson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#9

(#9) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Brunswick Corporation, Life Fitness, filed.(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brunswick Corporation, Life Fitness, filed.(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sunstone Cowboy Lessee, LP d/b/a Houston Marriott North, Sunstone Cowboy, LP, filed.(Beckelman, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for David Short to Appear as Attorney (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order Order Granting Leave to Appear

#3

(#3) MOTION for David Short to Appear as Attorney by Brunswick Corporation, LIFE FITNESS, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Leave to Appear)(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

1 #19

Exhibit Exhibit B-16

1 #18

Exhibit Exhibit B-15

1 #17

Exhibit Exhibit B-14

1 #16

Exhibit Exhibit B-13

1 #15

Exhibit Exhibit B-12

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit B-11

1 #13

Exhibit Exhibit B-10

1 #12

Exhibit Exhibit B-9

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER on #10 Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice. Sunstone Cowboy GP, LLC, Sunstone Cowboy Lessee GP, LLC, Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. and Marriott International, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dwain A Vaughns, Rabia Vaughns, filed.(Sampson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Sunstone Cowboy GP, LLC, Sunstone Cowboy Lessee GP, LLC, Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. by Dwain A Vaughns, Rabia Vaughns, filed. (Sampson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Brunswick Corporation, Life Fitness, filed.(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brunswick Corporation, Life Fitness, filed.(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sunstone Cowboy Lessee, LP d/b/a Houston Marriott North, Sunstone Cowboy, LP, filed.(Beckelman, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for David Short to Appear as Attorney (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Brunswick Corporation, Life Fitness, filed.(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for David Short to Appear as Attorney by Brunswick Corporation, LIFE FITNESS, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Leave to Appear)(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Brunswick Corporation, LIFE FITNESS, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Notice of Removal_File Stamped Copy)(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th District Court, Harris County, TX, case number 125th (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20638311) filed by LIFE FITNESS, Brunswick Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B-6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B-7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B-8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B-9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B-10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit B-11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit B-12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit B-13, #17 Exhibit Exhibit B-14, #18 Exhibit Exhibit B-15, #19 Exhibit Exhibit B-16, #20 Exhibit Exhibit B-17, #21 Exhibit Exhibit B-18, #22 Exhibit Exhibit B-19, #23 Exhibit Exhibit B-20)(McCracken, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRUNSWICK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant