This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 08:26:57 (UTC).

Vaughn v. Adducci et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 Vaughn filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Adducci. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McDonald and Terry L Wooten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-03308

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

Presiding Judge

Terry L Wooten

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Earnest Vaughn, Sr

Columbia, SC 29210

Earnest Edward Vaughn

Columbia, SC 29210

Earnest E Vaughn

Columbia, SC 29210

Defendants

Greenwood County Public Defender's Office

Thomas Adducci

 

Court Documents

22 #2

Envelope

#22

(#22) Additional Attachments to Main Document #20 Objection to Report and Recommendation. First attachment description: objection to report and recommendation. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

20 #2

Envelope

20 #1

envelope for entry 7

#20

(#20) OBJECTION to #18 Report and Recommendation by Earnest Vaughn, Sr. Reply to Objections due by 2/5/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. See additional attachments #22 (Attachments: #1 envelope for entry 7, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) Modified on 1/29/2019 to add linkage and edit text (kric, ). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#18

(#18) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

13 #2

Envelope

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 1/22/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/8/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/8/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/19/2018.(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

cover letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Earnest Vaughn, Sr. Service due by 3/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Additional Attachments to Main Document #20 Objection to Report and Recommendation. First attachment description: objection to report and recommendation. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) OBJECTION to #18 Report and Recommendation by Earnest Vaughn, Sr. Reply to Objections due by 2/5/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. See additional attachments #22 (Attachments: #1 envelope for entry 7, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) Modified on 1/29/2019 to add linkage and edit text (kric, ). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Order on Report and Recommendation, #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #13 Amended Complaint filed by Earnest Vaughn, Sr, #17 Order - 1983 - No Service placed in U.S. Mail to Earnest E Vaughn Sr (kric, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT ORDER withdrawing #11 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/19.(ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Earnest Vaughn, Sr. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Earnest Vaughn, Sr, #10 Order - 1983 - No Service placed in U.S. Mail to Earnest E Vaughn Sr (kric, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 1/22/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/8/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/8/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order, Court's Complaint form, summons form, USM-285 forms (2), copy of filer's proposed summonses and USM forms, placed in U.S. Mail to Earnest Vaughn (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/19/2018.(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • (#4) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenwood. (kric, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Earnest Vaughn, Sr. Response to Motion due by 12/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Debit Documents)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Earnest Vaughn, Sr. Service due by 3/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less