This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:09:36 (UTC).

VASKO v. SMITH et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 VASKO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFREY T VASKO

Charleston, SC 29414

Defendants

HY SMITH CONSULTING INC

GPS TRANSITIONS LLC

Hy C Smith

GPS PRACTICE SALES INC

PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC

HY SMITH

ADS FLORIDA LLC

PROFESSIONAL TRANSITIONS INC

PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC doing business as PRIDE INSTITUTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL RAMSEY

177 Meeting St Ste 300

Charleston, SC 29401

Defendant Attorneys

John Colquitt Rogers

285 Peachtree Center Avenue, Suite 2600

Atlanta, GA 30301-1235

JOSEPH A ZDRILICH

3575 Koger Blvd Ste 125

Duluth, GA 30096

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 2/22/2019. Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/28/2018. (chc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#9

(#9) Jurisdictional Statement by PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC (ZDRILICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

8 #1

Required Form

#8

(#8) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/10/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 7/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC (Zdrilich, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

1 #16

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #13

Exhibit M (Affidavit of Service on GPS Transitions)

1 #12

Exhibit L (Affidavit of Service on GPS Practice Sales)

1 #11

Exhibit K (State Court Case Initiation Form)

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit J (Hy Smith Summons)

1 #9

Exhibit I (Hy Smith Consulting Summons)

1 #8

Exhibit H (Pride Summons)

1 #7

Exhibit G (GPS Transitions Summons)

1 #6

Exhibit F (GPS Practice Sales Summons)

1 #5

Exhibit E (Pride's Answer)

1 #4

Exhibit D (Hy Smith Defendants' Answer)

1 #2

Exhibit B (GPS Answer)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against JEFFREY T VASKO Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2926776, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (GPS Answer), #3 Exhibit C (GPS Amended Answer), #4 Exhibit D (Hy Smith Defendants' Answer), #5 Exhibit E (Pride's Answer), #6 Exhibit F (GPS Practice Sales Summons), #7 Exhibit G (GPS Transitions Summons), #8 Exhibit H (Pride Summons), #9 Exhibit I (Hy Smith Consulting Summons), #10 Exhibit Exhibit J (Hy Smith Summons), #11 Exhibit K (State Court Case Initiation Form), #12 Exhibit L (Affidavit of Service on GPS Practice Sales), #13 Exhibit M (Affidavit of Service on GPS Transitions), #14 Exhibit N (Affidavit of Service on Pride), #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Rogers, John) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 2/22/2019. Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/28/2018. (chc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Jurisdictional Statement by PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC (ZDRILICH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (sbd) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • *DISREGARD*NOTICE TO COUNSEL JOSEPH C ZDRILICH - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd) Modified on 8/6/2018 Counsel was admitted to practice. His middle initial is "A" and was misidentified as "C".(cma). (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/10/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 7/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC (Zdrilich, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED DOCUMENT by GPS PRACTICE SALES INC, GPS TRANSITIONS LLC, HY SMITH CONSULTING INC, PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC, HY SMITH,amending #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Rogers, John) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED DOCUMENT by GPS PRACTICE SALES INC, GPS TRANSITIONS LLC, HY SMITH CONSULTING INC,amending #4 Jurisdictional Statement (Rogers, John) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Jurisdictional Statement by GPS PRACTICE SALES INC, GPS TRANSITIONS LLC, HY SMITH CONSULTING INC (Rogers, John) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL JOSEPH C ZDRILICH - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HY SMITH, HY SMITH CONSULTING INC, PRIDE INSTITUTE COMPANIES INC, GPS TRANSITIONS LLC, GPS PRACTICE SALES INC ); Notice to Counsel - CHRISTOPHER M. RAMSEY - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account. (sbd) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JEFFREY T VASKO. (sbd) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GPS PRACTICE SALES INC, GPS TRANSITIONS LLC, HY SMITH CONSULTING INC, Hy C Smith (Rogers, John) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against JEFFREY T VASKO Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2926776, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (GPS Answer), #3 Exhibit C (GPS Amended Answer), #4 Exhibit D (Hy Smith Defendants' Answer), #5 Exhibit E (Pride's Answer), #6 Exhibit F (GPS Practice Sales Summons), #7 Exhibit G (GPS Transitions Summons), #8 Exhibit H (Pride Summons), #9 Exhibit I (Hy Smith Consulting Summons), #10 Exhibit Exhibit J (Hy Smith Summons), #11 Exhibit K (State Court Case Initiation Form), #12 Exhibit L (Affidavit of Service on GPS Practice Sales), #13 Exhibit M (Affidavit of Service on GPS Transitions), #14 Exhibit N (Affidavit of Service on Pride), #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Rogers, John) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less