This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 16:10:14 (UTC).

Vargas et al v. Viacom International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 Vargas filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Viacom International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louis L. Stanton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00474

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis L. Stanton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bully Sound Records, Inc.

Luis Vargas

Defendants

Monami Entertainment LLC

James Rosario

Viacom International, Inc.

New Pop Culture Productions, Inc.

NFGTV, Inc

Eastern

VH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Martin Sack

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Thomas Perala

John Jacob Rosenberg

Gregory Hugh Griffith

Abigail Bain Everdell

Elizabeth A. McNamara

 

Court Documents

#106

#105

104 #1

Exhibit 1 -Marked-up Scheduling Order Showing Proposed Revisions

#104

#103

#102

#101

#100

#99

1 #23

Exhibit 23 - James R Snapchat Bah Gurl dated November 13 and 14_2017

1 #22

Exhibit 22 - Counsel Letter refuting take down notice to YouTube

1 #21

Exhibit 21 - Counsel Letter refuting take down notice to Tunecore

1 #20

Exhibit 20 - James R Instragram comments for Bah Gurl

1 #19

Exhibit 19- James R Instragram Bah Gurl

1 #18

Exhibit 18 - Split Sheet Music License

1 #15

Exhibit 15 - Lil Derk Tour Flyer 2

1 #14

Exhibit 14 - Lil Derk Tour Flyer 1

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Vargas to Bully Sound Records BAD GIRL Copyright Assignment 16-Jan-2

289 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Bully Sound Records, Inc., Luis Vargas. (Sack, Alan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 12/3/2019. (cf) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) ORDER granting #104 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. SO ORDERED, this 30th of Aug, 2019 that the application of plaintiffs Bully Sound Records and Luis Vargas, by consent, to extend the Fact Discovery Deadlines is hereby granted, and that the plaintiffs shall file the proposed Scheduling Order within 14 days of receipt of thisOrder. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/30/2019) (cf) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Alan M. Sack dated August 29, 2019. Document filed by Bully Sound Records, Inc., Luis Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Marked-up Scheduling Order Showing Proposed Revisions)(Sack, Alan) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of Monami Entertainment LLC, NFGTV, Inc. New Address: Rosenberg, Giger & Perala P.C., 1330 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 1800, New York, NY, 10019, (646) 494-5000. (Rosenberg, John) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of Monami Entertainment LLC, NFGTV, Inc. New Address: Rosenberg, Giger & Perala P.C., 1330 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 1800, New York, NY, 10019, (646) 494-5000. (Perala, Brett) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 63) is denied. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/21/2019) (ks) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/1/2019. (ml) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties, having conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), submit this proposed Scheduling Order in accordance with the Court's Order for Conference Pursuant to Rule 16(b), dated February 5, 2019: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2019. Status conference on Thursday Sept 12, 2019 at 3 p.m. as when to file a Joint Pretrial Order. Fact Discovery due by 9/3/2019. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5-8 days. This case is to be tried before a jury and further set forth in this Order. (Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Louis L. Stanton.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/1/2019) (rro) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b): Initial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/5/2019) (rro) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Alan Martin Sack. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alan Martin Sack to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the All Plaintiff radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the INDIVIDUALLY named filer/filers - select the INDIVIDUALLY named party/parties the pleading is against. DO NOT SELECT THE "ALL" RADIO BUTTONS. (pne) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Rosario a/k/a James R, re: #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bully Sound Records, Inc., Luis Vargas. (Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NFGTV, Inc. a/k/a Eastern, re: #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bully Sound Records, Inc., Luis Vargas. (Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New Pop Culture Productions, Inc., re: #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bully Sound Records, Inc., Luis Vargas. (Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monami Entertainment LLC, re: #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bully Sound Records, Inc., Luis Vargas. (Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Viacom International, Inc. a/k/a VH1 Networks, re: #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bully Sound Records, Inc., Luis Vargas. (Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,,, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Luis Vargas, Bully Sound Records, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NYS Entity Information-Bully Sound Records, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - BAD GIRL US Copyright Certificate of Registration SR 796-558 May 5_2017, #3 Exhibit 3 - Vargas to Bully Sound Records BAD GIRL Copyright Assignment 16-Jan-2018, #4 Exhibit 4 -Screenshot from the Show with James R BAH GURL, #5 Exhibit 5 - Spotify BAD GIRL Download Page and Copyright Notice, #6 Exhibit 6 - iTunes BAD GIRL Download Page and Copyright Notice, #7 Exhibit 7 - Amazon BAD GIRL Download page and Bully Sound Records Logo, #8 Exhibit 8 - Apple Music BAD GIRL Download Page and Bully Sound Records Logo, #9 Exhibit 9 - YouTube BAD GIRL Bully Sound Records, #10 Exhibit 10 - Music Publishing (Songwriter) Agreement dated April 18, 2016, #11 Exhibit 11-Addendum to Music Publishing Agreement dated April 7, 2017, #12 Exhibit 12 -Artist Management and Consulting Agreement dated April 4, 2016, #13 Exhibit 13 - Addendum to Artist Management and Consulting Agreement dated April 10, 2017, #14 Exhibit 14 - Lil Derk Tour Flyer 1, #15 Exhibit 15 - Lil Derk Tour Flyer 2, #16 Exhibit 16 - Straight Stuntin Magazine Cover, #17 Exhibit 17 - Rosario cameo appearance season 7 LHHNY, #18 Exhibit 18 - Split Sheet Music License, #19 Exhibit 19- James R Instragram Bah Gurl, #20 Exhibit 20 - James R Instragram comments for Bah Gurl, #21 Exhibit 21 - Counsel Letter refuting take down notice to Tunecore, #22 Exhibit 22 - Counsel Letter refuting take down notice to YouTube, #23 Exhibit 23 - James R Snapchat Bah Gurl dated November 13 and 14_2017)(Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14594462)Document filed by Luis Vargas, Bully Sound Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NYS Entity Information-Bully Sound Records, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - BAD GIRL US Copyright Certificate of Registration SR 796-558 May 5_2017, #3 Exhibit 3 - Vargas to Bully Sound Records BAD GIRL Copyright Assignment 16-Jan-2018, #4 Exhibit 4 -Screenshot from the Show with James R BAH GURL, #5 Exhibit 5 - Spotify BAD GIRL Download Page and Copyright Notice, #6 Exhibit 6 - iTunes BAD GIRL Download Page and Copyright Notice, #7 Exhibit 7 - Amazon BAD GIRL Download page and Bully Sound Records Logo, #8 Exhibit 8 - Apple Music BAD GIRL Download Page and Bully Sound Records Logo, #9 Exhibit 9 - YouTube BAD GIRL Bully Sound Records, #10 Exhibit 10 - Music Publishing (Songwriter) Agreement dated April 18, 2016, #11 Exhibit 11-Addendum to Music Publishing Agreement dated April 7, 2017, #12 Exhibit 12 -Artist Management and Consulting Agreement dated April 4, 2016, #13 Exhibit 13 - Addendum to Artist Management and Consulting Agreement dated April 10, 2017, #14 Exhibit 14 - Lil Derk Tour Flyer 1, #15 Exhibit 15 - Lil Derk Tour Flyer 2, #16 Exhibit 16 - Straight Stuntin Magazine Cover, #17 Exhibit 17 - Rosario cameo appearance season 7 LHHNY, #18 Exhibit 18 - Split Sheet Music License, #19 Exhibit 19- James R Instragram Bah Gurl, #20 Exhibit 20 - James R Instragram comments for Bah Gurl, #21 Exhibit 21 - Counsel Letter refuting take down notice to Tunecore, #22 Exhibit 22 - Counsel Letter refuting take down notice to YouTube, #23 Exhibit 23 - James R Snapchat Bah Gurl dated November 13 and 14_2017)(Sack, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less