This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2019 at 07:58:29 (UTC).

Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC v. Ross Group Construction Corporation, The et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Ross Group Construction Corporation, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00661

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC

United States of America

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Claimants

Ross Group Construction Corporation, The

Federal Insurance Company, The

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendant and Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brian Lee Mitchell

Attorney at Neuens Mitchell Bonds PLLC

2021 S Lewis Ave Ste 660

Tulsa, OK 74104

Jeffrey Michael Bonds

Attorney at Neuens Mitchell Bonds PLLC

2021 S Lewis Ave Ste 660

Tulsa, OK 74104

Sheila D Sayne

Attorney at Neuens Mitchell Bonds PLLC

2021 S Lewis Ave Ste 660

Tulsa, OK 74104

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Claimant Attorneys

John Edward Harper, Jr

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Timothy Lee Rogers

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to The Cincinnati Insurance Company Returned Executed (Re: #15 Third Party Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Vigilant Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Great Northern Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Custom Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Insurance Company of New Jersey, Other Affiliate Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company, The) by Federal Insurance Company, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

15 #2

Exhibit 2 Performance Bond

15 #1

Exhibit 1 - Subcontract

#15

(#15) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Cincinnati Insurance Company by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (With attachments) (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

14 #2

Exhibit 2 Performance Bond

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Subcontract

#14

(#14) COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (With attachments) (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Federal Insurance Company, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Causes of Action for Conversion and Failure to Pay on Open Account by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Lee Rogers on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The [Note: Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Federal Insurance Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Ross Group Construction Corporation, The(pty:dft).] (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Edward Harper, Jr on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The [Note: Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Federal Insurance Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Ross Group Construction Corporation, The(pty:dft).] (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Bonds on behalf of United States of America, Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Michael Bonds added to party United States of America(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Michael Bonds added to party Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC(pty:relpla).] (Bonds, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC (Mitchell, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sheila D Sayne on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Sheila D Sayne added to party United States of America(pty:pla).] (Sayne, Sheila) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1994212) by United States of America, Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC (Mitchell, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to The Cincinnati Insurance Company Returned Executed (Re: #15 Third Party Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#18) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Ross Group Construction Corporation, The Federal Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Vigilant Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Great Northern Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Custom Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Insurance Company of New Jersey, Other Affiliate Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company, The) by Federal Insurance Company, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Cincinnati Insurance Company by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (With attachments) (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (With attachments) (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Federal Insurance Company, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Causes of Action for Conversion and Failure to Pay on Open Account by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Lee Rogers on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The [Note: Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Federal Insurance Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Ross Group Construction Corporation, The(pty:dft).] (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Edward Harper, Jr on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The [Note: Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Federal Insurance Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Ross Group Construction Corporation, The(pty:dft).] (Harper, John) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Bonds on behalf of United States of America, Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Michael Bonds added to party United States of America(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Michael Bonds added to party Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC(pty:relpla).] (Bonds, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC (Mitchell, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sheila D Sayne on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Sheila D Sayne added to party United States of America(pty:pla).] (Sayne, Sheila) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Federal Insurance Company, The, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Lee Mitchell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1994212) by United States of America, Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC (Mitchell, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America, Vanwin Coatings of Virginia, LLC [Note: Attorney Brian Lee Mitchell added to party United States of America(pty:pla).] (Mitchell, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ross Group Construction Corporation, The is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Lee Mitchell