This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 17:02:06 (UTC).

VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC v. ASSURED RISK TRANSFER PCC, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ASSURED RISK TRANSFER PCC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Trevor N. McFadden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01451

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Trevor N. McFadden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

WILLIS TOWERS WATSON MANAGEMENT (VERMONT), LTD.

SYNDICATE 4472

SYNDICATE 2001

WILLIS RE INC.

SYNDICATE 1206

CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND

HANNOVER RUCKVERISHCERUNG AG

ASSURED RISK TRANSFER PCC, LLC

PARTNER REINSURANCE EUROPE, PLC

CAISSE CENTRALE DE REASSURANCE

WILLIS LIMITED

AM TRUST

XL CATLIN

LIBERTY SYNDICATES

HANNOVER RE

PARTNER RE

MS AMLIN

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John Albert Gibbons

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

1825 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

James Sumter Carter

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kierstan Lee Carlson

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

1825 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Maxwell A. Bryer

Attorney at WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER, LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019-6099

Christopher J. St. Jeanos

Attorney at WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER, LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019-6099

Elizabeth J. Bower

Attorney at WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER, LLP

1875 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

G. Richard Dodge, Jr.

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Brian D. Netter

Attorney at MAYER BROWN LLP

1999 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Madeleine L. Hogue

Attorney at MAYER BROWN LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Alanna Clair

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Shauna Guner

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Mary Ann D'Amato

Attorney at MENDES & MOUNT

3 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

William A. Davis

Attorney at MINTZ, LEVIN, COHN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, P.C.

701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington,, DC 20004

Vera Zolotaryova

Attorney at ALLEGAERT BERGER & VOGEL LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Alexander Eugene Ehrlich

Attorney at ALLEGAERT BERGER & VOGEL LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

David A. Berger

Attorney at ALLEGAERT BERGER & VOGEL LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Michael S. Vogel

Attorney at ALLEGAERT BERGER & VOGEL LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

James Richard Schiffer

Attorney at ALLEGAERT BERGER & VOGEL LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#133

(#133) ORDER granting #132 Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/3/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

132 #1

Text of Proposed Order /Stipulated Proposed Protective Order

#132

(#132) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order /Stipulated Proposed Protective Order)(Gibbons, John) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#131

(#131) NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna Guner on behalf of CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND, SYNDICATE 1206, SYNDICATE 2001, SYNDICATE 4472 (Guner, Shauna) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

130 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#130

(#130) MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Carlson, Kierstan) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#129

(#129) ANSWER to Counterclaim with Jury Demand #128 by VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC.(Gibbons, John); Modified text on 6/5/2019 (tth). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

128 #1

Exhibit A

#128

(#128) ANSWER to #96 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC by SYNDICATE 2001, SYNDICATE 1206, CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND, SYNDICATE 4472. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Clair, Alanna) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

353 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) ORDER granting #132 Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/3/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order /Stipulated Proposed Protective Order)(Gibbons, John) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna Guner on behalf of CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND, SYNDICATE 1206, SYNDICATE 2001, SYNDICATE 4472 (Guner, Shauna) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Status Conference held on 6/21/2019. Initial Disclosures due by 6/27/2019. Third-party Pleadings and Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Post-fact Discovery Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Affirmative expert disclosures due by 1/31/2020. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 3/6/2020. Expert depositions due by 4/3/2020. Post-discovery Status Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ERROR re #130 Meet and Confer Statement; emailed to Carlson@BlankRome.com, cc'd 22 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please do not refile. In the future, ECF login and signatue must match. (ztth, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Carlson, Kierstan) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) ANSWER to Counterclaim with Jury Demand #128 by VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC.(Gibbons, John); Modified text on 6/5/2019 (tth). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • NOTICE of Rescheduled Hearing: The parties shall take notice that the Status Conference currently set for June 17, 2019 is rescheduled to June 21, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) Modified on 5/31/2019 to correct hearing type and date (hmc). (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) ANSWER to #96 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC by SYNDICATE 2001, SYNDICATE 1206, CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND, SYNDICATE 4472. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Clair, Alanna) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) ANSWER to #96 Amended Complaint, by CAISSE CENTRALE DE REASSURANCE, HANNOVER RUCKVERISHCERUNG AG, PARTNER REINSURANCE EUROPE, PLC.(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIS RE INC. served on 8/7/2017, answer due 8/28/2017 (Carter, James) (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PARTNER REINSURANCE EUROPE, PLC served on 8/3/2017, answer due 8/24/2017 (Carter, James) (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HANNOVER RUCKVERISHCERUNG AG served on 8/3/2017, answer due 8/24/2017 (Carter, James) (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ASSURED RISK TRANSFER PCC, LLC served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017 (Carter, James) (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND served on 8/3/2017, answer due 8/24/2017 (Carter, James) (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017 (Carter, James) Modified on 8/15/2017 (jf). (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to ASSURED RISK TRANSFER PCC, LLC, CAISSE CENTRALE DE REASSURANCE, CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND, HANNOVER RUCKVERISHCERUNG AG, PARTNER REINSURANCE EUROPE, PLC, SYNDICATE 1206, SYNDICATE 2001, SYNDICATE 4472, WILLIS LIMITED, WILLIS RE INC., WILLIS TOWERS WATSON MANAGEMENT (VERMONT), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC. (Gibbons, John) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ASSURED RISK TRANSFER PCC, LLC, CAISSE CENTRALE DE REASSURANCE, CATLIN RE SWITZERLAND, HANNOVER RUCKVERISHCERUNG AG, PARTNER REINSURANCE EUROPE, PLC, SYNDICATE 1206, SYNDICATE 2001, SYNDICATE 4472, WILLIS LIMITED, WILLIS RE INC., WILLIS TOWERS WATSON MANAGEMENT (VERMONT), LTD. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5040489) filed by VANTAGE COMMODITIES FINANCIAL SERVICES I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Summons CAISSE CENTRALE, #25 Summons CATLIN RE, #26 Summons HANNOVER, #27 Summons PARTNER REINSURANCE, #28 Summons SYNDICATE 1206, #29 Summons SYNDICATE 2001, #30 Summons SYNDICATE 4472, #31 Summons WILLIS LIMITED, #32 Summons WILLIS RE, #33 Summons WILLIS TOWERS, #34 Summons ASSURED RISK)(Gibbons, John) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less