This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2019 at 07:42:24 (UTC).

Van Holland v. Woodbury Clerk of Courts et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 Van Holland filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Woodbury Clerk of Courts. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-04090

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce M Van Holland

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Defendants

Judge Edward Jacobson

Erin Redmond

Iowa Judicial Qualifications Commission

James Redmond

Woodbury Clerk of Courts

Deena Townley

Judge Mary Sokolovke

Judge Jeffrey Neary

Judge Duane E Hoffmeyer

 

Court Documents

4 #1

New Case Packet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** Summons/new packet with NEF provided to plaintiff at counter. (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (src) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#3

(#3) PRO SE AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Joyce M Van Holland. Copy with NEF to filer at counter. (src) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER: Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Joyce M Van Holland: Amended Complaint due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 11/14/18. (Copy of Order w/NEF and 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 new case packet mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (kfs) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Complaint with Jury Demand

1 #1

Supplement

#1

(#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joyce M Van Holland. NEF mailed to filer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, #3 Cover Sheet) (src) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** Summons/new packet with NEF provided to plaintiff at counter. (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (src) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Joyce M Van Holland. Copy with NEF to filer at counter. (src) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Joyce M Van Holland: Amended Complaint due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 11/14/18. (Copy of Order w/NEF and 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 new case packet mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (kfs) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joyce M Van Holland. NEF mailed to filer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, #3 Cover Sheet) (src) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.