This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:05:03 (UTC).

Value Wholesale, Inc. v. KB Insurance Co. Ltd

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 Value Wholesale, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against KB Insurance Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05887

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Value Wholesale, Inc.

Defendants

KB Insurance Co. Ltd d/b/a Kookmin Best Insurance Company (US Branch) f/k/a Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd.

KB Insurance Co., Ltd

KB Insurance Co., Ltd doing business as Kookmin Best Insurance Company (US Branch) formerly known as Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd.

Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard S. Schurin

Attorney at Stern & Schurin LLP

595 Stewart Avenue, Suite 510

Garden City, NY 11530

Steven Stern

Attorney at Stern & Schurin LLP

595 Stewart Avemie, Suite 510

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #8

Exhibit G - Decision in West Bend case

1 #7

Exhibit F - Initial Disclosures in Abbott Litigation

1 #6

Exhibit E - Second Response Letter

1 #5

Exhibit D - Second Denial Letter

1 #4

Exhibit C - Response Letter

1 #3

Exhibit B - Initial Denial Letter

1 #2

Exhibit A1 - Insurance Policy 2

1 #1

Exhibit A - Insurance Policy 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Value Wholesale, Inc.. KB Insurance Co., Ltd served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Schurin, Richard) (Entered: 11/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to KB Insurance Co., Ltd. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Value Wholesale, Inc. (Schurin, Richard) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Stern on behalf of Value Wholesale, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Stern, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions, including the ***CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Value Wholesale, Inc. (Schurin, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Value Wholesale, Inc. (Schurin, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KB Insurance Co. Ltd d/b/a Kookmin Best Insurance Company (US Branch) f/k/a Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10859497 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Value Wholesale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy 1, #2 Exhibit A1 - Insurance Policy 2, #3 Exhibit B - Initial Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit C - Response Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Second Denial Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Second Response Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Initial Disclosures in Abbott Litigation, #8 Exhibit G - Decision in West Bend case) (Schurin, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KB Insurance Co. Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co. Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Scott Schurin