This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:36:20 (UTC).

Newton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Newton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa G. Newton

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Walmart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Matthew Womack

Attorney at Warren & Griffin, P.C.

736 Georgia Avenue, Suite 600, Dome Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorney

Gregory W Callaway

Attorney at Howell & Fisher PLLC

300 James Robertson Parkway, Court Square Building

Nashville, TN 37201-1107

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT of the parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/24/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/20/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 9/13/18. (CMH) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#11

(#11) Filed in error. Please disregard this entry. ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/23/2018. (CMH, ) Modified on 8/23/2018 (GRE, ). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

10 #1

Notice of Consent\Non-Consent

#10

(#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

8 #1

Other proposed order

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party defendant to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#7

(#7) Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/20/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

2 #1

Other attachment to business disclosure

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other attachment to business disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Bradley County, case number V-18-382. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3740071), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Other civil cover sheet)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT of the parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/24/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy on 9/20/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/20/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 9/13/18. (CMH) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Party. The parties have filed a joint Motion to substitute Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. in the place of Walmart, Inc. as the proper defendant in this lawsuit. For good cause shown, the motion to substitute [Doc. 8] is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the claims against Walmart, Inc. shall be dismissed without prejudice, and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. shall be substituted as the sole defendant in this case. The parties and the Clerk's office shall change the caption of the case to reflect this substitution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8/24/18. (Steger, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed in error. Please disregard this entry. ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/23/2018. (CMH, ) Modified on 8/23/2018 (GRE, ). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party defendant to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/20/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Added Corporate Parents/Affiliates to Walmart, Inc (Role - dft): War-Mart Stores East, L.P. WSE Management, LLC; WSE Investment, LLC and Wal-Mart Stores, East, LLC pursuant to #2 Certificate of Corporate Interest. (BJL,) Modified on 8/13/2018 (BJL, ). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other attachment to business disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Bradley County, case number V-18-382. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3740071), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Other civil cover sheet)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less